Kabasinskas v. Haskin et al
Plaintiff: Lenore Kabasinskas
Defendant: William R. Haskin, US Xpress Leasing, Inc., US Xpress, Inc. and George W. Wesley, II
Case Number: 8:2010cv00111
Filed: March 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Defendants' Motion to Strike Rebuttal Experts and Motion in Limine (Filing No. 152 ) is granted in part, as follows: Plaintiffs are precluded, in limine, from calling Defendants' experts Lew Grill and Jeffrey S hield or presenting any portion of their expert reports in the Plaintiffs case in chief. The Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Motion to Strike and Motion in Limine (Filing No. 159 ) is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 142 Motion to Extend. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2012 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 2/14/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 87 Motion in Limine. Defendants' motion in limine (Filing No. 87 ) to exclude the testimony of the Plaintiff's proposed experts David W. Kassekert, Paul Eason, and Steven Krizan is granted. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAB)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment on the issue of punitive damages (Filing No. 92 ) is granted; and The Defendant's objection to the Plaintiff's second responsive brief and evidence (Filing No. 120 ) is granted. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TEL)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting Motion to Extend 109 . IT IS ORDERED:The Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of Case ( 52 ), is further amended, as follows: Paragraph 4 of the Order is amended to state that the plaintiff's rebuttal expert witnesses sh all be disclosed by July 15, 2011. Paragraph 5 of the order is amended to state that the Nonexpert Witnesses shall be disclosed on or before July 25, 2011. Paragraph 5 (c) is amended to state that the trial exhibits deadline is extended to August 1 8, 2011. Paragraph 6 of the order is amended to state that the non-expert motions in limine shall be filed on or before July 25, 2011. The final pretrial conference with the undersigned magistrate judge remains set for Thursday, August 25, 2011 at 1:30 P.M. The jury trial before the Honorable Laurie Smith Camp remains set for the week of September 13, 2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TEL)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 98 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time. The Plaintiff's response to the Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment must be filed on or before May 2, 2011. The Magistrate Judge shall defer ruling on discovery matters relating to the issue of punitive damages, as discussed above, until this Court resolves the Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAB)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 80 Joint MOTION to Extend Progression and Trial. Plaintiff is given until 3/25/2011 to file a reply brief in support of plaintiff's Motion to Compel 70 . Jury Trial continued from 6/21/2011 to 9/13/2011 at 8:30 AM in C ourtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Final Pretrial Conference continued from 5/23/2011 to 8/25/2011 at 1:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 72 Motion to Extend Deadlines. The final progression order 52 is further amended, as requested. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting MOTION to Extend Certain Dates filed by Lenore Kabasinskas, and amending Final Progression Order 52 . Expert disclosure deadlines extended as requested. Amended Complaint due by 11/1/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On or before July 30, 2010, attorney Scott R. Jackson shall register to practice in this district and register for the court' CM/ECF System or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the court. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order to Scott R. Jackson at his last known address. Show Cause Deadline set for 7/30/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (Copies mailed as directed)(AOA)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kabasinskas v. Haskin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Haskin
Represented By: Cristi L. Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Xpress Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Peter L. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Xpress, Inc.
Represented By: Cristi L. Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George W. Wesley, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenore Kabasinskas
Represented By: Scott R. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?