Daly v. Sams Club Wal-Mart Stores
Plaintiff: Susan Kaye Daly
Defendant: Sams Club Wal-Mart Stores
Case Number: 8:2010cv00174
Filed: May 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, 7 is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Complaint 1 filed by Susan Kaye Daly. The court now conducts an initial review of the Complaint to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate. Plaintiff shall have until July 15, 2010, to amend her Complaint and clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: Check for amended complaint on July 15, 2010. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JAB)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis isprovisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daly v. Sams Club Wal-Mart Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Kaye Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sams Club Wal-Mart Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?