Zhang v. GMH Communities Trust et al
Plaintiff: Jun Zhang
Defendant: American Campus Communities Service, Inc., American Campus Communities, Inc., College Park Management Trs Inc., GMH Communities Trust, GMH Management, Inc. II, GMH Management, Inc., d/b/a Scott Residence Hall and Scott Residential Management LLC
Case Number: 8:2010cv00242
Filed: June 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 95 Motion to Dismiss Certain Defendants. The following parties are dismissed from this suit: GMH Communities Trust; GMH Management, Inc., d/b/a/ Scott Residence Hall; American Campus Communities, Inc. and GMH Management, Inc., II. T he Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska shall adjust the court's computerized record-keeping system to reflect the dismissal of these defendants. Plaintiff's claims remain pending against College Park Management TRS, Inc.; American Campus Communities Service, Inc. and Scott Residential Management, LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett for final disposition. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER- The Clerk of Court shall terminate GMH Communities Services Trust, Inc. from this case as it is not a defendant or party to this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER regarding Amended Complaint, 74 . This matter is before the court on its own motion. It is ordered that by or before June 13, 2011, the parties shall submit a joint response to this motion clarifying whether the entity identified in docket entry 74 as "GMH Communities Services Trust, Inc.", is, in fact, a party to this lawsuit. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhang v. GMH Communities Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Campus Communities Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Campus Communities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: College Park Management Trs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMH Communities Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMH Management, Inc. II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMH Management, Inc., d/b/a Scott Residence Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Residential Management LLC
Represented By: Kathryn A. Dittrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jun Zhang
Represented By: Kathleen M. Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?