United States of America v. Salazar et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: CitiFinancial, Inc. (MD), Michael F. Kivett, Midland Funding, LLC, Araceli Salazar and Manuel Salazar
Case Number: 8:2010cv00328
Filed: September 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that in the event no objection to the confirmation of sale is filed, plaintiff's MOTION to Confirm Sale 40 shall be considered without hearing. If an objection is filed, all issues raised will be heard before the Court at 12:00 p.m. on 12/12/2011 in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge Richard G. Kopf. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order to CitiFinancial, Inc. (MD) and Araceli Salazar. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (JSF)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE in the amount of $38,631.56, plus interest credit or subsidy in the amount of $5,430.99, and interest as of June 30, 2011, in the amount of $5,010.76, together with $34.57 in late charges, $3,468.23 in fees currently assessed and required, plus interest accruing from then at a daily rate of $8.33, until the date of entry of this decree; granting plaintiff's motion for default judgment 32 against defendants Manuel Salazar, Araceli Salazar, Michael F. Kivett, Trustee, CitiFinancial, Inc. (MD), and Midland Funding, LLC. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed to defendants) (TEL)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting Motion to Set Aside Judgment 21 and Motion for authorization to seek service out of time 22 . IT IS ORDERED: Filing 21 , Plaintiff's motion to set aside judgment, etc., is granted. Accordingly, the Judgment and Decree of For eclosure and Order of Sale entered on April 11, 2011 (filing 20 ), is hereby vacated and set aside for Plaintiff's failure to complete service on Defendant, CitiFinancial, Inc. (MD). Filing 22 , Plaintiff's motion for authorization to seek service out of time is granted. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(m), Plaintiff shall have sixty (60) days from today's date to complete service on Defendant, CitiFinancial, Inc. (MD). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (TEL)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE in the amount of $38,631.56 principal, $5,430.00 interest credit or subsidy, plus accrued interest in the amount of $4,043.91, late charges in the amount of $34.57, and $2, 715.36 in fees currently assessed and required, together with interest accruing at the rate of $8.20 per day from February 24, 2011, until the date of entry of this decree. Interest will accrue on said sums from and after the date of entry of th is decree at the legal rate of 0.27 % computed daily and compounded annually until paid in full; setting priority of liens and directing sale of premises; granting Plaintiff USA's motion for default judgment 18 against defendants Manuel Salazar, Araceli Salazar, Michael F. Kivett - Trustee and Midland Funding, LLC. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to defendants via U.S. Mail) (AOA)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - The Clerk's Office shall strike filing no. 5 from the record and the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Refile its Motion for Publication (filing no. 6 ) is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Salazar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiFinancial, Inc. (MD)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Kivett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Araceli Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert L. Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?