Hudson v. Omaha Public School District
Plaintiff: Beatrice Hudson
Defendant: Omaha Public School District
Case Number: 8:2010cv00330
Filed: September 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave; Plaintiff shall have until January 17, 2011, to file an amended complaint ; The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline with the following text: January 17, 2011: Deadline to file amendedcomplaint; Plaintiff must keep the court informed of her current address at all times while this case is pending. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB, )
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff shall have until December 9, 2010, to amend her Complaint - Pro Se 1 and clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against Defendant in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Check for amended complaint on December 9, 2010. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB, )
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER provisionally granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Omaha Public School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omaha Public School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?