United States of America v. Flores-Parra et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Eva L. Flores and Juan Jose Flores-Parra
Case Number: 8:2010cv00333
Filed: September 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE in the amount of $39,931.40 plus accrued interest in the amount of $8,450.73 together with interest accruing at the rate of.18 percent computed daily and compounded annually until paid in full; setting priority of liens and directing sale of premises; granting plaintiff's motions for default judgment filings 22 and 47 . Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed to defendants)(GJG)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Motion to Set Aside Marshal's Sale - The marshal's sale conducted on September 21, 2011, is hereby set aside. The United States District Court Clerk's Office is directed to return the $1,700.00 down payment to Jose G. Perez and Maria Bentura Perez. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed to Jose G. Perez and Maria Bentura Perez) (E-mailed to Financial) (TEL)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE in the amount of $44,194.84, plus accrued interest at the legal rate of.18 percent computed daily and compounded annually until paid in full; setting priority of liens and directing sale of premises; granting plaintiff's motion for default judgment 22 against defendants Juan Jose Flores-Parra and Eva L. Flores. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG) (Copies sent to defendants via U.S. Mail)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation that this bankruptcy and adversary proceeding be withdrawn to the U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska 20 . Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TEL)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - This case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska; This case shall be terminated for statistical purposes by the Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska; and The Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska shall transmit the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed to defendants) (KBJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Flores-Parra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva L. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Jose Flores-Parra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Laurie M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?