Bradley v. Brian Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Juan Bradley
Defendant: Brian Hospital, Clarksen Hospital, Lincoln General Hospital and Saint Joseph Hospital
Case Number: 8:2010cv00405
Filed: October 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is not entitled to proceed IFP on appeal and the appeal is dismissed. The Clerk of the court shall not process the appeal to the Eighth Circuit. The Clerk of the court is directed to forward a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the parties and to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals regarding: Notice of Appeal to USCA 20 filed by Juan Bradley. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(KBJ)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is not entitled to proceed IFP on appeal and the appeal is dismissed. The Clerk of the court shall not process the appeal to the Eighth Circuit. The Clerk of the court is directed to forward a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the parties and to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. All pending motions 16 are denied. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(KBJ)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until January 31, 2011, to either submit the $455.00 appellate filing fee or a Motion to Proceed IFP, with the required affidavit. If Plaintiff takes no action, his appeal will not be processed. Plai ntiff is reminded that the Prison Litigation Reform Act makes the prisoner liable for payment of the full $455.00 appellate filing fee regardless of the outcome of the appeal. The Clerk of the court shall not process the appeal in this matter pending further order of the court regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA 11 . Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(KBJ)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal 7 is denied. This matter is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(KBJ)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 2 is denied. Plaintiff has until November 29, 2010, to either show cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(g) or pay the ful l $350.00 filing fee. In the absence of either action by Plaintiff, this matter will be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: November 29, 2010: Deadline for Plaintiff to show cause or pay full filing fee. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KBJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Brian Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarksen Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln General Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Joseph Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?