Goodwin v. Creighton University
Plaintiff: Violet L. Goodwin
Defendant: Creighton University
Case Number: 8:2010cv00423
Filed: October 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis (filing no. 22 ) is granted. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Court of Appeals with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (filing no. 15 ) is granted and Goodwin's claims against Defendant are dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Complaint 1 filed by Violet L. Goodwin. After initial review, Plaintiff's Title VI claim may proceed. The Clerk of the court shall send ONE (1) summons form and ONE (1) USM-285 form to Plaintiff for completion and return. Failure to do so may result in dismissal. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 3/30/2011: Check for completion of service of summons. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms)(JAB)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER provisionally granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. Creighton University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creighton University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet L. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?