Moss v. Outlook Nebraska, Inc.
Plaintiff: Glen Moss
Defendant: Outlook Nebraska, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2011cv00019
Filed: January 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TO WITHDRAW EXHIBITS or to show cause why exhibits should not be destroyed. Ordered by District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KMG)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion to amend, Filing No. 118 , is denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to extend, Filing No. 106 , is denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED: Defendant's motion in limine, Filing No. 70 , is denied, subject to reassertion at trial. Plaintiff's motion in limine, Filing No. 73 , is denied, subject to reassertion at trial. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER - This matter is before the court on the oral motion (Filing No. 83) of the parties to continue the trial of this matter scheduled for January 22, 2013. Following a discussion with counsel on January 10, 2013, trial of this matter is rescheduled for April 8, 2013. IT IS SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. Outlook Nebraska, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Moss
Represented By: Scott C. LaBarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outlook Nebraska, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin A. Pinaire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?