Redden v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 1521
Plaintiff: Darrell Redden
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 1521
Case Number: 8:2011cv00036
Filed: February 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice because the Amended Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order and the courts April 15, 2011, Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR, )
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiff shall have until May 6, 2011, to amend his Complaint andclearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against Defendant, in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended comp laint, this matter will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. In the event that Plaintiff files an amended complaint, Plaintiff shallrestate the allegations of the current Complaint (filing no. 1 ) and any new allegations. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in the abandonment of claims. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 5/6/2011 Check for amended complaint on May 6, 2011, and dismiss if none filed.) Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Clerk of the court is directed to reassign this matter from United States District Judge Warren Urbom to the undersigned. This matter remains assigned to the pro se docket. The Clerk of the court is directed to indicate on each docket sheet that case numbers 8:11CV34 and 8:11CV36 are related. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redden v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 1521
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 1521
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Redden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?