Lawrey et al v. Good Samaritan Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Lawrey
Defendant: Dawn M. Murray, Good Samaritan Hospital and Kearney Clinic, P.C.
Case Number: 8:2011cv00063
Filed: February 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and in the Alternative a New Trial (Filing No. 141 ) is denied. Plaintiff's Request for Hearing (Filing No. 143 ) is denied. Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial Because of Defendants' Improper Closing Argument (Filing No. 144 ) is denied. Plaintiff's Request for Hearing (Filing No. 146 ) is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall restrict the access of the indexes of evidence found at Filing Nos. 145 and 142 , and the attachments thereto, to the case participants of the above captioned action. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Plaintiffs' Opposition [to] Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiff[s'] Experts (Filing No. 98 ) is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TEL)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Preclude Cumulative Expert Testimony (Filing No. 77 ) is denied without prejudice to the Plaintiffs presenting their Rule 403 objections at the time of trial. Defendants' Motion in Limine (Filing No. 79 ) is granted. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Defendants' Undisclosed Literature and References to Such Literature at Trial in this Matter (Filing No. 83 ) is denied, without prejudice to Plaintiffs reasserting their objections at trial. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order (filing 61 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 40 ) is granted. Defendant Good Samaritan Hospital is dismissed from Plaintiff's Complaint without prejudice, at Plaintiffs' cost. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - James R. Welsh, is stricken as an attorney of record for the plaintiff Dawn Lawrey, and shall not be noticed of events in this case. Said attorney may apply to be readmitted as an attorney of record after paying the annual assessment pursuant to NEGenR 1.7(h). Attorney James R. Welsh terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On or before April 14, 2011 attorney James R. Welsh shall pay the 2011/2012 biennial attorney assessment fee, as required by NEGenR 1.7(h) or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the court. The Clerk shall transmit a copy of this order to James R. Welsh at his last known address. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copies mailed as directed)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrey et al v. Good Samaritan Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn M. Murray
Represented By: James A. Snowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Samaritan Hospital
Represented By: Susan K. Sapp
Represented By: Mark A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kearney Clinic, P.C.
Represented By: James A. Snowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Lawrey
Represented By: Kenneth M. Levine
Represented By: Christopher P. Welsh
Represented By: James R. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?