January 16, 2013 |
Filing
283
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The stipulation of the parties is approved and adopted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to release the supersedeas bond (Filing No. 249 ) and the supplemental supersedeas bond (Filing No. 254 ) posted by defendants Bamfo rd, Inc., and Nancy Maret Packer, Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Packer, and deposited with the Clerk of the Court. Plaintiffs release and discharge defendants as principles and Arch Insurance Company as surety on the supersedeas bond and on the supplemental supersedeas bond. This action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (E-mailed to Financial)(TCL )
|
August 20, 2012 |
Filing
258
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendants' motion 230 for new trial, or in the alternative, for consideration of a remittitur, is denied. Defendants' request for oral argument is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
August 3, 2012 |
Filing
247
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendants' motions for approval of amount of supersedeas bond (Filing No. 239 ) and amount of supersedeas bond (Filing No. 241 ) are granted in part. The supersedeas bond submitted by defendants in the amount of $ 10,800,000.00 will be filed today with the clerk of the court. The stay of execution on the July 16, 2012, judgment will be extended through Wednesday, August 8, 2012. If defendants file a supplemental supersedeas bond in the amount of $227,51 8.04 on or before Wednesday, August 8, 2012, then the stay of execution will be extended throughout the post-trial motion and appeal process. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file evidence (Filing No. 245 ) is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
July 16, 2012 |
Filing
228
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that defendants' withdrawal of objection to entry of judgment is granted; the objection to entry of judgment (Filing No. 225 ) is deemed withdrawn. The clerk of court shall enter judgment in accordance with the verdict of the jury. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
July 5, 2012 |
Filing
226
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendants shall have until July 13, 2012, to file a brief in support of their opposition to entry of judgment. Plaintiffs shall have until July 20, 2012, to file a brief in opposition to defendants' objection. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
June 25, 2012 |
Filing
200
ORDER denying 194 motion for reconsideration. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
|
June 21, 2012 |
Filing
190
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs' request for ruling on videotape depositions taken for use at trial (Filing Nos. 152) is granted. Defendants are instructed to edit the videotape depositions in accordance with the Courts rulings listed above. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
June 19, 2012 |
Filing
180
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT the parties shall re-designate the depositions they intend to use at trial. Such designations shall be filed with the Court no later than Wednesday, June 20, 2012, at 5 p.m. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
June 18, 2012 |
Filing
155
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendants' motion to exclude or limit the expert testimony of Dr. Shannon Shipp (Filing No. 105) is granted in part, to the extent that Dr. Shipp will not refer to a specific future rate of inflation in his testimony or in his expert report. The Court reserves ruling on all remaining motions in limine and will address each issue as it may arise during the course of the trial. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
February 16, 2012 |
Filing
71
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendants' motion to compel plaintiff Bobby Davis to appear (Filing No. 64 ) is granted as to the examination by Dr. Callahan, as consistent with this memorandum and order. Defendants' requests for oral argument and expedited hearing with regard to this motion are denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
February 14, 2012 |
Filing
69
SECOND AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - granting 68 Motion to Extend. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2012 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial set for 6/25/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
January 9, 2012 |
Filing
62
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motion to compel plaintiff Bobby Davis to appear (Filing No. 49 ) is granted as to examinations by Dr. Kroeger and Dr. Davis, as consistent with this memorandum and order. Defendants' motion to compel plaintiff Bobby Davis to appear (Filing No. 49 ) is denied as to an examination by Mr. Schmidt. The Court's protective order (Filing No. 48 ) is rescinded as to plaintiff Bobby Davis, and the stay on the protective order is lifted as to plaintiffs Brenda Davis and Geoffrey Davis. Defendants' motion to extend scheduling deadlines by two months (Filing No. 53 ) is granted, and the final progression order (Filing No. 37) will be amended, including extensions of time for disclosure of expert witnesses, completion of discovery, pretrial motions, final pretrial conference, and trial date. Defendants' request for oral argument with regard to these motions is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
November 29, 2011 |
Filing
54
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The order granting plaintiffs' motion for protective order (Filing No. 48 ) is stayed. Defendants shall file a surreply brief with the Court responding to plaintiffs' reply brief and affidavits by December 6, 2011. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
November 22, 2011 |
Filing
48
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for protective order 42 is granted. Defendants shall conduct the depositions of plaintiffs at Fee, Smith, Sharp & Vitullo, LLP, Three Galleria Tower, 13155 Noel Road, Suite 1000, in Dallas, Texas. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
April 29, 2011 |
Filing
31
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2011 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
April 25, 2011 |
Filing
26
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that defendants' motion 25 is granted. The parties shall have until April 28, 2011, to file their Rule 26(f) Planning Conference Report. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|