WorldCare Limited Corporation v. World Insurance Company
Plaintiff: WorldCare Limited Corporation
Defendant: World Insurance Company
Counter Defendant: WorldCare Limited Corporation
Counter Claimant: World Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2011cv00099
Filed: March 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: On or before November 7, 2011, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, at smithcamp@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The Rule 16 planning conference set for November 7, 2011, is cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ON ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY - Pursuant to the Court's Order of August 17, 2011 (filing 95), and the terms and representations contained in the Joint Electronic Discovery Agreement submitted by the parties, the following provisions shall govern the production of electronic discovery in this case as set forth in this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The parties shall submit a joint proposed order concerning the limitations and procedures regarding electronic discovery on or before August 24, 2011. The proposed order shall include (or exclude) the provisions suggested by WorldCare in Exhibit A to Filing No. 90. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Filing No. 5 ) filed by Plaintiff WorldCare Limited Corporation, is granted. Defendant World Insurance Company and its officers, agents, servants, employees, and all persons acting in co ncert with World Insurance, are enjoined from using the designation "WORLDCARE" or any other name or mark confusingly similar to "WORLDCARE," either alone or in combination with other words or symbols, as part of any trademark, se rvice mark, trade name, product name, corporate name, assumed name, domain name, Web site name, email address or in any other manner in connection with healthcare or medical-related services during the pendency of this action. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SCHEDULING ORDER - Defendant is given until and including 4/1/2011 to serve its Answer to the Complaint. Counsel of record who are not registered to practice in the District of Nebraska and/or for the court's CM/ECF System, see NEGenR 1.3 and 1.7, shall do so no later than 4/20/2011. These requirements will be excused for attorneys who timely request leave to withdraw as counsel in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copies mailed to unregistered attorneys)(CLS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WorldCare Limited Corporation v. World Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WorldCare Limited Corporation
Represented By: Patrick S. Cooper
Represented By: Jack I. Siegal
Represented By: Dana A. Zakarian
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Alquist
Represented By: Nicholas A. Pisarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: WorldCare Limited Corporation
Represented By: Patrick S. Cooper
Represented By: Jack I. Siegal
Represented By: Dana A. Zakarian
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Alquist
Represented By: Nicholas A. Pisarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: World Insurance Company
Represented By: William R. Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Harty
Represented By: Brian J. Brislen
Represented By: Christine Lebron-Dykeman
Represented By: Bradley J. Powers
Represented By: James M. Andriola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian J. Brislen
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Harty
Represented By: William R. Johnson
Represented By: Christine Lebron-Dykeman
Represented By: Bradley J. Powers
Represented By: James M. Andriola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?