Evans v. First National Bank of Omaha
Plaintiff: Milton Evans
Defendant: First National Bank of Omaha
Case Number: 8:2011cv00124
Filed: April 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION that this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff shall have until February 17, 2012, to show cause why this case should not be dismissed. If plaintiff does not respond, or if good cause is not shown, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without fur ther notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline with the following text: February 17, 2012: deadline for plaintiff to show cause why service of process was not completed. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(ADB, )
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the clerk shall send 1 summons and 1 USM-285 form to plaintiff together with a copy of this memorandum and order. Plaintiff shall send the completed forms back to the clerk. The clerk is directed to set a Pro Se Case Management Deadline for 12/15/2011: Check for completion of service of summons. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copies mailed as directed) (JSF)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Plaintiff shall have until July 14, 2011, to amend his complaint and clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against defendant, in accordance with this memorandum and order. If plaintiff fails to file an amended c omplaint, this matter will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. In the event that plaintiff files an amended complaint, plaintiff shall restate the allegations of the current complaint (Fi ling No. 1 ) and any new allegations. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in the abandonment of claims. ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/14/2011 to check for amended complaint and dismiss if none filed ). Plaintiff shall keep the Court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. First National Bank of Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?