Bass v. Roberts Dairy
Plaintiff: Carl Bass
Defendant: Roberts Dairy
Case Number: 8:2011cv00146
Filed: April 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 41 Motion to Continue Pretrial order Deadlines. The Final Pretrial Conference, scheduled for September 6, 2012, at 10:00 a.m., is cancelled. The parties are also relieved from all obligations relating to preparation of the Order on Final Pretrial Conference, pending resolution of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment; and The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum and Order to Magistrate Judge Zwart. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(MKR)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants Motions to Compel (Filing Nos. 24 and 30 ) are denied without prejudice to reassertion after the resolution of the pending Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiffs Motion to Continue Deposition (filing no. 21 ) and Defendants Motion to Amend Order (filing no. 23 ) are granted. This matter is progressed as set forth within the order. Final Pretrial Conference will be held before the Magistrate Judge on September 6, 2012, at 10:00 a.m.. The trial date will be set by the Magistrate Judge at the time of the Final Pretrial Conference.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR, )
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- To obtain service of process on Defendant, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons form which the Clerk of the court will provide. The Clerk of the court shall send ONE (1) summons form and ONE (1) USM-285 form to Plainti ff together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk of the court. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the Clerk of the court will sign the sum mons form, to be forwarded with a copy of the Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. Plaintiff is granted, on the courts own motion, an extension of time until 120 days from the date of this order to complete service of proces s. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline inthis case with the following text: "December 15, 2011: Check for completionof service of summons;". Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed as directed)(MKR)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiffs FMLA claim may proceed. However, summons will not be issued until after amendment of Plaintiffs other claims, a set forth in this Memorandum and Order; Plaintiff shall have until July 25, 2011, to amend his Complaint to clearly state a claim under the ADA and Title VII upon which relief may be granted against Defendant, in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, Plaintiffs ADA and Title VII claims against Defend ant will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; In the event that Plaintiff files an amended complaint, Plaintiff shall restate the allegations of the current Complaint (filing no. 1 ), and any new allegations. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in the abandonment of claims. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/25/2011;Check for amended complaint on July 25, 2011 and issue summons if none filed.) Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court finds that Plaintiff is financially eligible to proceed in forma pauperis. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bass v. Roberts Dairy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts Dairy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?