International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22 and National Electrical Contractors Association Nebraska Chapter Health and Welfare Plan et al v. Morrissey Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22 and National Electrical Contractors Association Nebraska Chapter Health and Welfare Plan, National Electrical Benefit Fund, Omaha Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local No. 22 Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund, Omaha Electrical Joint Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund, IBEW Local 22/NECA Defined Contribution Plan B, IBEW Local 22/NECA Pension Plan A and Julie Fast
Defendant: Morrissey Electric Company and Boss Electric, L.L.C.
Case Number: 8:2011cv00152
Filed: May 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED: The parties' joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Filing No. 68 ) is approved. This action is dismissed without prejudice. The Court will not assess costs or attorney's fees in this case. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 51 the parties' Joint Motion to Extend. Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2013 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 3/19/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Jury Demands (filing 19 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22 and National Electrical Contractors Association Nebraska Chapter Health and Welfare Plan et al v. Morrissey Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22 and National Electrical Contractors Association Nebraska Chapter Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Electrical Benefit Fund
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omaha Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local No. 22 Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omaha Electrical Joint Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 22/NECA Defined Contribution Plan B
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 22/NECA Pension Plan A
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Fast
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrissey Electric Company
Represented By: Thomas F. Hoarty, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boss Electric, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?