October 1, 2015 |
Filing
184
ORDER - In accordance with the Consent Order (Filing No. 85 ) and the Eighth Circuit's decision affirming the Court's Judgment in this matter (see Filing Nos. 181 and 182 ), IT IS ORDERED: the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)(GJG)
|
April 16, 2014 |
Filing
176
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Motion to Alter or Amend and for Relief from a Final Judgment (Filing No. 171 ) filed by Defendant Michael B. Kratville, is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
January 28, 2014 |
Filing
168
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 97 ), filed by the Plaintiff, U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission ("CFTC") against Defendant Michael B. Kratville ("Kratville"), is granted. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
|
October 2, 2013 |
Filing
155
ORDER - The motion of Stuart Dornan and Mallory Hughes to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Michael Kratville (filing 148 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the appearances of Mr. Dornan and Ms. Hughes as counsel of record for Defendant Michael Kratville and shall terminate future notices to them in this matter. This case will not be stayed pending Defendant Kratville's retention of substitute counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
|
August 16, 2013 |
Filing
146
ORDER - Kratville's Motion for Show Cause Hearing and Application to Hold Michael J. Welke in Contempt for Failure to Obey Subpoena to Produce Documents (filing 118 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG )
|
July 12, 2013 |
Filing
132
ORDER - The Motion for Extension of Response Deadline (filing 123 ) is denied as moot. A telephone conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on August 16, 2013, at 10:00 a.m., for the purpose of reviewing the status of this case. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call to the Court at 402-661-7340. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
July 9, 2013 |
Filing
121
ORDER regarding Motion for Show Cause Hearing filing 118 . IT IS ORDERED that by or before August 9, 2013, Defendant Michael Welke shall submit a report to the Court showing cause as to why he should not be held in contempt for failing to comply with the subpoena served upon him on April 16, 2013. Welke shall further show cause as to why he should not be compelled to appear for a deposition to provide all responsive documents. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
|
June 28, 2013 |
Filing
117
ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Remove this Case From Trial Calendar and Extend Pretrial Deadlines (filing 115 ) is granted. The Court will reset the trial date and pretrial deadlines, if necessary, following the Court's ruling on the p ending summary judgment motion. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Correct Caption and Docket (filing 116 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove the following names from the case caption and docket: FXIG, Fred Honea, Ron Basset, Sonador, Michael Stewart, Neil Labelle and John Rizzli. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG, )
|
June 24, 2013 |
Filing
114
ORDER - Any objection to removing this case from the jury docket shall be filed by or before July 22, 2013. If no objection is filed, the case will be placed on the non-jury docket. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
January 31, 2013 |
Filing
81
SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 80 Unopposed Motion to Extend. Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2013 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 9/17/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
|
January 29, 2013 |
Filing
79
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Defendant Michael Kratville (filing 65 ) is granted. Michael Kratville shall produce the documents in question by or before February 12, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
|
January 15, 2013 |
Filing
72
ORDER regarding MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Defendant Michael Kratville 65 filed by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission. By or before January 22, 2013, Defendant Michael Kratville shall submit copies of the documents in question to the Court for review. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
|
August 3, 2012 |
Filing
61
AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 59 Joint Motion for Extension. Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2013 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 7/16/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
|
July 5, 2012 |
Filing
57
PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding motion for protective order filing 56 . The Court hereby GRANTS the motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
|
June 22, 2012 |
Filing
55
ORDER granting 54 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mr. Domina shall immediately serve a copy of this Order upon Mr. Welke, as well as a copy of the Progression Order (filing 48 ) entered in this case, by certified mail. Mr. Domina shall timely file proof of service showing compliance with Paragraph 1 of this Order, listing the names and addresses of the persons to whom notice was sent. Mr. Domina will not be relieved of applicable duties to the Court, the client, and opposing counsel unti l proof of service is filed. Upon the filing of proof of service pursuant to Paragraph 2 of this Order, Mr. Welke will be deemed to be proceeding pro se, that is, without the assistance of counsel, unless substitute counsel has entered a written appearance on his behalf. If substitute counsel has not entered a written appearance, Mr. Welke shall file a written notice with the Clerk of the Court of his current address and telephone number within five (5) business days of being served with the documents described in Paragraph 1 of this Order. Mr. Welke may retain substitute counsel at any time; however, until such time as substitute counsel enters a written appearance, Mr. Welke shall personally comply with all orders of this Court, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Rules of Practice. Mr. Welke shall note that trial of this case is scheduled during the week of January 15, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
|
June 23, 2011 |
Filing
28
ORDER - Kratville's motion to set aside default (filing 21 ), amended motion to set aside default (filing 23 ) and second amended motion to set aside default (filing 25 ) are denied as moot. Kratville shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before July 22, 2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
|
June 22, 2011 |
Filing
27
ORDER - Kratville's Objection to Clerk's Entry of Default (filing 19 ) is sustained. The Clerk of Court shall set aside the entry of default against Kratville. All other defendants named in the Clerk's Entry of Default (filing 17 ) r emain subject to the entry order. Kratville's motion for an extension of time to file an answer (filing 18 ) is granted. Kratville shall answer or otherwise respond on or before July 22, 2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
|