Sorensen v. Fraternal Order of Eagles
Plaintiff: Debra Sorensen
Defendant: Fraternal Order of the Eagles
Case Number: 8:2011cv00258
Filed: July 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER that on or before May 15, 2014, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive document). Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice in accordance with NECivR 41.1. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion for Reconsideration of Summary Judgment (Filing No. 96 ) submitted by Defendant Fraternal Order of the Eagles, Local Chapter 200, is denied. The Motion in Limine (Filing No. 102 ) submitted by Defendant Fraternal Order of the Eagles, Local Chapter 200, is denied, without prejudice to the Defendant raising its objections at the time of trial. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER that Grand Aerie of the Fraternal Order of Eagles' Objections to the Plaintiff's Evidence 88 are granted in part, as follows: The Court will not consider portions of the Plaintiff's evidence not properly authenticated, irreleva nt, constituting hearsay, or representing speculation or conclusions of law, and the Objections are otherwise denied. Grand Aerie of the Fraternal Order of Eagles' Motion for Summary Judgment 73 is granted. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Stipulation for Dismissal. The second (NFEPA Gender Discrimination) and third (Constructive Discharge) causes of action contained in the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Am. Compl., Filing No. 42 at 45-57) are dismissed without prejudice to the filing of new actions. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The plaintiff shall have until September 13, 2012, to amend the complaint. The parties shall have until October 10, 2012, to file any motions for summary judgment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The parties shall file a joint report with the court in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) on or before the close of business on December 20, 2011, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon them in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that on or before December 9, 2011, the defendant shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 or show cause by written affidavit why the defendant cannot comply with the rules of the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER regarding Travis Thorne Bennington's motion withdraw as counsel for the defendant 8 , which is further held in abeyance until November 29, 2011. The defendant shall have until November 29, 2011, to file a response to the motion to withdra w. Moving counsel shall immediately serve a copy of this order on the defendant and file a certificate of service for such service by November 8, 2011, or be subject to sanctions for failure to comply with this court's orders. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Travis Thorne Bennington's motion withdraw as counsel for the defendant (Filing No. 8 ) is held in abeyance until October 25, 2011. The defendant shall have until on or before October 25, 2011, to file a response to the motion to withd raw with the Clerk of Court. If no response is received or if substitute counsel has entered an appearance by that date, the motion to withdraw will be granted. Moving counsel shall immediately serve a copy of this order on the defendant and file a certificate of service for such service. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TEL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorensen v. Fraternal Order of Eagles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraternal Order of the Eagles
Represented By: Travis T. Bennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Sorensen
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?