Brown v. West Corporation
Plaintiff: Rex Brown
Defendant: West Corporation
Case Number: 8:2011cv00284
Filed: August 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER TO WITHDRAW EXHIBITS OR TO SHOW CAUSE WHY EXHIBITS SHOULD NOT BE DESTROYED.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER approving and adopting the Joint 272 Stipulation for Dismissal of the parties. This action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER that Attorney Kelly Brandon has a pending case in this court and has not paid the 2013/2014 Attorney Assessment. Attorney Kelly Brandon is directed to pay the $20.00 fee or show cause why this fee cannot be paid within 30 days from the date of this order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JLS, )
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendant's motion to exclude evidence regarding West Employee Robert Henderson 242 is granted. Defendant's motion to exclude the voice mail of Troy Eaden to plaintiff is granted. Defendant's motion to exclu de evidence that Steve Stangl referred to African Americans as "Canadians" is granted. Defendant's motion to exclude evidence regarding criticism of President Obama that did not include racially discriminatory remarks is granted. Defe ndant's motion to preclude plaintiff from referring to West's attorneys as being from somewhere other than Omaha is denied. The balance of defendant's motion is denied without prejudice to the defendant making further objections at trial. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER granting 196 motion to strike the opinions and exclude the testimony of Dr. Brian H. Kleiner. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 200 Motion to Strike the opinions and exclude the testimony of Donald L. Frankenfeld. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER denying as moot 216 motion to extend as the parties have filed the responses at issue. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting 229 Motion to Extend. The final Pretrial Conference is rescheduled for 4/21/2014 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. The parties shall have until April 11, 2014, to exchange pretrial disclosures, and until to 12:00 p.m. on April 16, 2014, to exchange objections to such disclosures. The parties shall have until close of business on April 17, 2014, to submit a final agreed on draft of the proposed final pretrial order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM AND PROTECTIVE ORDER denying 206 Motion to Quash Subpoena. Neither party to the present litigation shall inquire of Aegis as to the motivation for Brown's termination from Aegis. Depositions of and document requests to Aegis by th e parties shall be limited to the issue of Brown's individual performance and efforts to maintain employment, except that the parties may inquire as to any assertions by Brown that Aegis is responsible for certain periods of front pay. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER, from USDC-TX, 3:14MC28, by Judge Ed Kinkeade transferring to District of Nebraska the MOTION to Quash 206 and Index 207 filed by Aegis USA. Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade. (ADB)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting 190 Joint Motion to Extend. The parties shall have until the week of March 24, 2014, to take the deposition of the Aegis Communications representative. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER denying as moot 142 Motion for Protective Order; denying as moot 154 Motion to Compel. The show cause order (Filing No. 186) is withdrawn. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER that no later than February 13, 2014, plaintiff shall file with the court a brief explaining why the motions (Filing Nos. 142 and 154) should not be denied as moot. No later than February 21, 2014, defendant shall, if necessary, file a response explaining why the motions should not be denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 PROTECTIVE ORDER - The plaintiff's motion for a protective order 166 is granted as to the issues of plaintiff's application, orientation, and training. The remainder of plaintiff's motion for a protective order is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting 177 Motion to Extend Limited Deadlines. The discovery deadline is extended to February 21, 2014, for the depositions identified in the motion, and the Rule 104 motions that do not require an evidentiary hearing deadline shall be April 29, 2014. Further, there will be no Rule 104 evidentiary hearing unless the Court deems is necessary. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER - The joint motion, filing 169 , is granted. Defendant shall have until January 10, 2014, to respond to plaintiff's motion and plaintiff shall have until January 20, 2014, to file a reply brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for sanctions is denied. Plaintiff's objections to the Magistrate Judge's order are overruled. Plaintiff's request for court ordered mediation is denied. Plaintiff's request for an "Order of Cooperation" is denied. Plaintiff's request for a hearing is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC granting 135 Motion to Extend Response Deadlines. Defendant shall have until September 23, 2013, to respond to plaintiff's objections to Magistrate Thalken's order and recommendations regarding electronically stored information, custodians and search terms and to plaintiff's motion for sanctions. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER, upon referral Order 100 , as part of the defendant's obligation to produce ESI, it shall complete a search of Thielen's computer for certain listed terms. The plaintiff's request for additional custodians and terms is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 SIXTH AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 123 Unopposed Motion to Amend Fifth Amended Final Progression Order Deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2014 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial set for 5/6/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 FIFTH AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 116 Joint Motion to Amend Fourth Amended Final Progression Order Deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2014 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial set for 2/25/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER upon consultation with the parties and the Notice 99 , the Court finds that further discovery will be expedited by referral of some discovery issues to the Magistrate Judge. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (E-mailed to Judge Thalken)(ADB)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 FOURTH AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - granting 86 Joint Motion to Amend Third Amended Final Progression Order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2013 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial set for 11/5/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Compel; defendant's Motion to Strike 64 , 77 , and 78 are denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 AMENDED SECOND FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 44 Motion to Amend Final Progression Order and granting 49 Motion to Amend Final Progression Order Enlarging the Number of Depositions. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2013 at 10:00 AM in Ch ambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial set for 6/3/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the Joint Motion to Extend Expert Witness Disclosure Deadline (Filing No. 25 ). The Court finds the motion should be granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 21 Joint Motion to Amend Final Progression Order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2013 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial set for 3/4/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (SLP)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2011 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. West Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Brown
Represented By: Kelly K. Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Corporation
Represented By: Julie A. Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?