Abraham v. Douglas County
Plaintiff: |
Gary Abraham |
Defendant: |
Douglas County and Douglas County Sheriff Dept |
Case Number: |
8:2011cv00302 |
Filed: |
September 7, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Lyle E. Strom |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 16, 2013 |
Filing
65
MEMORANDUM OPINION - A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
|
February 20, 2013 |
Filing
64
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Court construes plaintiff's December 6, 2012, Objection (Filing No. 53 ) as a response to defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk's office is directed to update the docket s heet to reflect that Filing Number 53 is a response to defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons explained to plaintiff in the Court's November 27, 2012, Memorandum and Order, plaintiff's "Motion for Hearing and F air Trial" (Filing No. 57 ) is denied. Plaintiff's "Motion to Suspend or Hold in Abeyance All Proceedings" (Filing No. 59 ), "Objections to Defendant Proposed Final Pretrail [sic] Order" (Filing No. 60 ), and "2 nd Objection to Defendant Objection" (Filing No. 63 ) are granted only to the extent that the final pretrial conference in this matter, currently scheduled for March 14, 2013, is cancelled. The conference may be rescheduled after the resolution of defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerK's office is directed to cancel the final pretrial conference in this matter, currently scheduled for March 14, 2013. Defendant's Objections to plaintiff's Objections (Filing Nos. 54 and 61 ) are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
|
December 27, 2012 |
Filing
56
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 38 Plaintiff's Statement of Objections to Magistrate Judge Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
|
November 27, 2012 |
Filing
52
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Protection Order/Court Intervention (Filing No. 37 ) and Objection (Filing No. 47 ) are denied. Defendant's Objection to Motion for Protection Order (Filing No. 39 ), Objectio n to Objection (Filing No. 41 ), Objection to Brief (Filing No. 45 ), and Objection (Filing No. 48 ) are granted. Defendant has filed its Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 49 ). Plaintiff is reminded that he has 21 days from the date of filing to respond to the Motion for Summary Judgment. The Final Pretrial Conference remains scheduled for March 14, 2013, at 11:00 a.m. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
|
May 10, 2012 |
Filing
21
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time on Progression Order (Filing No. 18 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Filing No. 17 ) is denied as moot. (Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2012 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
|
January 19, 2012 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - To obtain service of process on defendant, plaintiff must complete and return the summons form which the clerk of the court will provide. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the clerk of the court. The clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: "May 16, 2012: Check for completion of service of summons." Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy with form mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
October 14, 2011 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until November 14, 2011, to amend his complaint and clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against Douglas County, Nebraska, in accordance with this memorandum and order. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, plaintiff's complaint will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Check for amended complaint on November 14, 2011, and dismiss if none filed. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
October 4, 2011 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is provisionally granted, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?