Blair v. Douglas County et al
Plaintiff: Steven R. Blair
Defendant: Donald Kliene, Jane and John Doe Douglas County Court Reporters, Stuart Dornan, Douglas County, Douglas County Court Administrators and James Jansen
Case Number: 8:2011cv00349
Filed: October 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER that Blair's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Preparing Fees or Costs (Filing No. 159) is granted regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA 158 filed by Steven R. Blair. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER denying 142 the plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories Douglas County. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time for Complete Disclosure and Additional Expert Witnesses (Filing No. 137 ) is granted. The court will re-progress the case deadlines as becomes necessary after resolution of the defendant's motion for summary judgment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The plaintiff shall have until April 4, 2014, to respond to the defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 131 ) on the basis of the Eleventh Amendment and res judicata. Plaintiff shall respond to other argume nts; however, in the event the plaintiff believes it is necessary to obtain additional discovery to respond to the defendant's other grounds for summary judgment, the plaintiff shall set forth in his response the specific discovery required, why the discovery is required, and why the discovery has not been accomplished previously. The defendant may file a reply on or before April 14, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Timothy L. Ashford's motion to withdraw as counsel (Filing No. 110 ) is granted. Mr. Ashford shall serve a copy of his motion and this order on Mr. Blair and file a notice of such service with the court. The notice sha ll contain Mr. Blair's current address. Steven R. Blair is hereby considered proceeding pro se and counsel for the defendant may communicate with the plaintiff directly regarding this case until new counsel, if any, enters an appearance on t he record. The planning conference previously scheduled to be held by telephone on December 5, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. shall be held in person in Courtroom 7, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 AMENDED ORDER FOR INITIAL PROGRESSION OF CASE - IT IS ORDERED: The defendant's Motion to Extend Case Progression Deadlines (Filing No. 94 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: The defendant shall have until August 15, 2013, to file an answer to the plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Planning Conference set for 12/5/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. The defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 49 ) is granted in part and denied in part: A. To the extent the Blair alleges any state law claims for malicious prosecution, false imprisonment, use of fraudulen t police reports, and procurement of unreliable and fabricated evidence and testimony, those claims are dismissed with prejudice. B. Blair's claims against Frank Goodroe and Douglas County Court Administrators are dismissed with prejudice. C. Blair's claims against Kleine, Dornan, and Jansen are dismissed with prejudice. D. The motion is denied in all other respects. 2. The plaintiff's Consolidated Motion for Leave to Add/Substitute Parties and Amend Complaint (Filing No. [71 ]) is denied as moot. 3. The plaintiff's Motion in Support of Third Amend (sic) Complaint (Filing No. 79 ) is granted as specifically set forth above. The plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint by July 18, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Blair's Motion to Strike Incorrect Affidavit and to File the Exhibits (Filing No. 75 ) is granted. Blair's Motion to Conduct Limited Discovery to Address the Issue of Qualified Immunity (Filing No. 74 ) is denied. Blair has until June 25, 2013, to respond to McKeever and Vondra's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 59 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The plaintiff's Consolidated Motion for Leave to Add/Substitute Parties and Amend Complaint (Filing No. 71 ) is held in abeyance pending compliance with NECivR 15.1(a) and/or NECivR 7.1(a)(1). The plaintiff shall have to on or before June 24, 2013, to file the amended motion as described above. Otherwise, the plaintiff's motion will be deemed abandoned and denied. If opposed, the defendants shall have ten (10) business days after the plaintiff's amended motion is filed to file any opposition. The plaintiff shall have five (5) business days thereafter to file a reply. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken for final disposition. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED:Defendants Mary S. McKeever and Loretta Vondra have until June 17, 2013, to consent to jurisdiction before the undersigned judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c)(1), otherwise this case will be reassigned in accordance with this court's standard procedures.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Amended ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 the plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Reply to Douglas County's Second Motion to Dismiss. The plaintiff shall have until May 29, 2013, to file a response to the Second Motion to Dismiss Douglas County Defendants 49 . Amended to attach PDF document to entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 34 ) is denied. The defendants shall have until April 15, 2013, to file a motion to dismiss. The Clerk of the Court is directed to amend the case caption as reflected on this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The parties shall report to the court in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) on or before the close of business on February 15, 2013, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon them in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Blair's claims against Kliene, Dornan, and Jansen are dismissed without prejudice. Blair's claims against Douglas County may proceed to service. Blair must complete and return the summ ons form that the clerk of the court will provide to him. The court directs the clerk of the court to send ONE summons form and ONE USM-285 form to Blair, together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Blair shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the clerk of the court. In the absence of the forms, service of process cannot occur. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the clerk of the court will sign the summons form, to be forwarded with a co py of the Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. The Marshal shall serve summons and the Complaint without payment of costs or fees. Service may be by certified mail pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 and Nebraska law in the discretion of the Marshal. The Clerk of the court will copy the Complaint, and Plaintiff does not need to do so. Blair is hereby notified that failure to obtain service of process on a defendant within 120 days of the date of this order may res ult in dismissal of this matter without further notice as to such defendant. A defendant has 21 days after receipt of the summons to answer or otherwise respond to a complaint. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: "May 25, 2012: Check for completion of service of summons." Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. Douglas County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Kliene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Doe Douglas County Court Reporters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Dornan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Court Administrators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven R. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?