Charvat v. First National Bank of Wahoo
Plaintiff: Jarek Charvat
Defendant: First National Bank of Wahoo
Case Number: 8:2012cv00097
Filed: March 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER OF DISMISSAL- The Parties' Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss 51 is approved. The above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice; and The Court will not assess costs or attorney's fees.Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 39 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendant First National Bank of Wahoo will respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 11, 2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KMG)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Stay and to Continue (filing 28 ) is granted. Progression of this case will be stayed, including Defendant's obligation to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint, pending the resolution of Defendant's petition for writ of certiorari. Defendant shall file a status report in this case every thirty days until further order of this Court. Status Report due by 1/3/2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On or before July 9, 2012, the parties may file a response to this Order, showing cause, if any, as to why the Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 7 ), filed by Defendant First National Bank of Wahoo, should not be granted. Show Cause Deadline set for 7/9/2012. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - All further proceedings in this matter are stayed pending the Supreme Court's decision in First American Financial Corp. v. Edwards, No. 10-708(cert. granted, June 20, 2011). When the Supreme Court's decision is filed, the Defendant must notify the Court of the decision by filing a notice with the Court within seven days of the date of the decision. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charvat v. First National Bank of Wahoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarek Charvat
Represented By: Michael P. Lewis
Represented By: Tracy L. Hightower-Henne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Wahoo
Represented By: Kenneth W. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?