Thompson v. Nebraska Department of Corrections et al
Petitioner: Larry A. Thompson
Respondent: Fred Britten, Robert P. Houston and Nebraska Department of Corrections
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2012cv00191
Filed: May 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. Because Petitioner was allowed to proceed in forma pauperis in this matter, he may proceed on appeal in forma pauperis without further authorization from this court. Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner shall have until January 28, 2013, to file a Motion for Certificate of Appealability and Brief in support. In the event that Petitioner fails to file a Motion and Brief, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, the court will deny the issuance of a Certificate of Appealability without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: January 28, 2013: check for filing of Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration (Filing No. 17 ) is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Thompson's Petition (Filing No. 1 ) is dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. The Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the Petition to Respondents and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By July 26, 2012, Respondents shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court reco rds in support of an answer. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 26, 2012: deadline for Respondents to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. If Respondents elect to file an answer, the procedures as set out in this Memorandum and shall be followed by Respondents and Petitioner. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case usi ng the following text: August 27, 2012 check for Respondents to file answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and respondents as directed)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Nebraska Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fred Britten
Represented By: Stacy M. Foust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert P. Houston
Represented By: Stacy M. Foust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nebraska Department of Corrections
Represented By: Stacy M. Foust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?