Ribeiro et al v. Baby Trend, Inc.
Plaintiff: Deanna Ribeiro and Franco Ribeiro
Defendant: Baby Trend, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2012cv00204
Filed: June 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 823 ORDER that Gregory K. Garland is stricken as an attorney of record for the Plaintiffs. Said attorney may apply to be readmitted as an attorney of record only after paying the 2017/2018 attorney assessment fee, as required by NEGenR 1.7(h). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 819 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that on or before July 28, 2017, attorney Gregory K. Garland, shall pay the assessment or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the court. Failure to comply with this order will result in the court removing Mr. Garland as counsel of record for the plaintiffs. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 813 ORDER that this matter came on for a conference on April 17, 2017 on oral motion of the parties. The Defendant Lerado Group requests a deposition or an order requiring defendant Mark Sedlack to appear for trial testimony. After argument and due c onsideration, the court orders that defendant Mark Sedlack shall make himself available for trial testimony at the request of the parties. However, he is required to appear only once during the trial. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 805 AMENDED ORDER ON PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - estimated length of trial is 10 days; Jury Trial set for 4/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CCB)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The defendants' joint motion to strike plaintiffs' rebuttal expert reports, (Filing No. 723 ) is denied. Defendant IMMI's motion to strike the plaintiffs' rebuttal expert disclosures (Filing No. 646 ) is denied. Defendants' motions to strike Ted Sokol's new opinions (Filing Nos. 770 and 775 ) are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 774 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The plaintiffs' and defendant Baby Trend's pending motions (Filing Nos. 573, 679, 681, 685, 687, 689, 691, 693, 696, 699, 705, 708, 711, and 725) have been withdrawn and are denied as moot. Baby Trend's request for a period of up to 60 days in which to submit settlement papers is granted. The plaintiffs and defendant Baby Trend shall submit settlement and dismissal papers on or before June 12, 2017. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 734 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that defendant Baby Trend's motion to reconsider, Filing No. 578 , is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER granting 621 Motion for Leave. The sur-reply brief, Filing No. 622, is deemed filed. No additional briefing will be permitted regarding IMMI's motion for summary judgment. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER that the Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Filing No. 570 ) is granted in part, and denied in part, as set forth above. Baby Trend shall produce the non-redacted registration card within twenty-one days of this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER denying 550 Defendants' Joint Motion for Continuance and Joint Motion for Expedited ruling. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CCB)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER AMENDING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 530 Unopposed Motion to Extend. Deadlines are extended as set out in this order. The 3/27/2017 final pretrial conference and the 4/24/2017 jury trial remain unchanged. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER that the Motion for Protective Order Re: Lerado Defendants' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Location (Filing No. 514 ) is granted. The parties are to meet and confer within one week of this order to schedule the deposition of the Lerado Rule 30(b)(6) via videoconference on a date mutually agreed upon by the parties. The deadline to complete depositions shall be extended to November 30, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER granting 518 Motion to Dismiss Party. Defendants Holmbergs Safety System Holding AB f/k/a Holmbergs Childsafety AB; Holmbergs Childsafety AB f/k/a Kendrion Holmbergs AB d/b/a Holmbergs; Holmbergs Safety System Holding AB f/k/a Holmbergs Childsafety Holding AB d/b/a Holmbergs; Gnosjgruppen AB f/k/a Kendrion Automotive Metals AB d/b/a Holmbergs; and Holmbergs Safety System Holding AB are dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Baby Trend Depositions (Filing No. 469 ) and Defendants' Motion to Quash the Depositions of Betty Tsai, Denny Tsai, and Chip Whalen (Filing No. 474 ) are granted, in part, and denied in part, as set forth above. Defendants' Joint Motion to Modify and Expand the Number of Depositions (Filing No. 485 ) is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 493 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration, construed as a Rule 59(e) motion (Filing No. 447), or alternatively for a stay, is denied. Defendant Gnotec's request regarding costs is denied as premature. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER AMENDING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 483 the parties' Consent Motion to Modify the Case Progression. Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2017 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 4/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Lerado Entities, to Compel Lerado's Answers to Plaintiffs' Written Discovery, and, if necessary, for Leave to Extend Deadlines 478 is denied, subject to reassertion after meeting and conferring in accordance with this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CS)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Notices of Deposition under Rule 30(b)(6), or, in the alternative, for Entry of a Protective Order (Filing No. 433 ), is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 435 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Gnotec Reftele AB's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Filing No. 341 ) is granted. Lerado (Zhong Shan) Industrial Co., Ltd.'s motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Filing No. 347 ) is denied. Lerado China Limited's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, (Filing No. 348 ) is denied. Lerado Group Company, Ltd.'s motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Filing No. 349 ) is denied. Lerado H.K. Limited's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Filing No. 350) is denied. Lerado Group (Holding) Company, Ltd.'s motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Filing No. 351 ) is denied. Pl aintiffs' motion for a hearing (Filing No. 312 ) is denied. Defendants Dorel Industries, Inc.'s and Maxi Miliaan B.V.'s motions to dismiss (Filing Nos. 394 & 393 ), presently held in abeyance, are denied without prejudice to refiling. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER that the motion to extend response deadline (Filing No. 416 ) filed by Plaintiffs is granted. The motion to dismiss (Filing No. 393 ) filed by Defendant Maxi Miliaan, B.V and the motion to dismiss (Filing No. 394 ) filed by Defendant Dorel Industries, Inc. shall be held in abeyance until the Lerado defendants' liability is resolved in the underlying action. In the event the Lerado defendants are found liable, the court will re-set the briefing schedule a reasonable time thereafter as to Dorel and Maxi's motions to dismiss (Filing No. 393 and Filing No. 394 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER that Plaintiffs' motion to quash (Filing No. 395 ) is granted. Defendants motion to compel (Filing No. 386 ) is denied. Counsel are to meet and confer to schedule depositions in a manner consistent with this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER that the Defendants' Motion to Compel Inspections and Testing (Filing No. 384 ) is granted. Nondestructive visual inspection of the car seat at issue shall take place on April 6, 2016, in accordance with Defendants' proposed nondestructive inspection protocol. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER that Defendants' motion to dismiss, Filing No. 201, is denied as moot; Defendant's motion to dismiss, Filing No. 213, is denied as moot; and Plaintiffs' motion for a hearing, Filing No. 312, is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 333 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER AMENDING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 318 unopposed Motion to Continue. Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2017 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 2/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER that by October 9, 2015, the parties shall confer and schedule the remaining Lerado corporate depositions. However, these depositions shall occur no later than November 30, 2015. Plaintiffs' responses to the Motions to Dismiss filed by Gno tec and the Lerado Defendants shall be filed within thirty days of completion of the Lerado corporate depositions. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Scheduling of Jurisdictional Depositions and for Leave to Extend Deadlines (filing 254 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER denying 250 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Scheduling of Jurisdictional Deposition of Gnotec (filing 231) is granted. Gnotec must make itself available for a 30(b)(6) deposition no later than July 29, 2015. Plaintiffs shall respond to Gnotec's motion to dismiss by August 14, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MBM)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Attorney Gregory K. Garland is to pay the biennial assessment. Show Cause Deadline set for 6/15/2015.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting 221 Motion for Leave to Extend Deadline. Plaintiffs shall take 30(b)(6) depositions of representatives of Gnotec by or before June 29, 2015. Plaintiffs shall respond to Gnotec's motion to dismiss by July 14, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, adopting 216 Stipulation of the parties. Deposition deadline is 3/1/2016. Final pretrial conference set for 9/26/2016 at 10:00 A.M., in chambers, with Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. A jury trial before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon is set for the week of 10/24/2016 at 8:30 A.M., in Courtroom 3, Third Floor, Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Extend Deadline and to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery 209 is granted. Plaintiffs shall take 30(b)(6) depositions of Baby Trend and the Lerado defendants challenging jurisdiction by or before June 4, 2015. Plaintiffs shall respond to the pending motion to dismiss no later than June 19, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting 195 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Elizabeth Smith's appearance as counsel for Defendant Holmbergs Childsafety Co., Ltd. and shall terminate future notices to her in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 167 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of the Court shall terminate Frank A. Taylor and the law firm of Briggs and Morgan, P.A. and William G. Dittrick and the law firm of Baird Holm LLP, as counsel for Lerado, and shall terminate future notices to them in this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that the deadlines and hearings set out in the Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression (#35), including the pretrial conference and trial dates, are stayed until further order of the court. The parties will continue discovery. A Status Conference will be held on 11/25/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Motion to Withdraw Joseph Gross as Attorney. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Joseph Gross, Jr.'s appearance as counsel for Defendant and shall terminate future notices to Mr. Gross in this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered pursuant to the parties' Stipulation for Protective Order 38 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER regarding Notice (Other) 36 filed by Franco Ribeiro, Deanna Ribeiro. The plaintiffs' cause of action against defendants Denny Tsai and Betty Tsai only, is hereby dismissed in its entirety, without prejudice, and with the parties to be responsible for their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Attorney Gregory K. Garland is to pay the biennial assessment. Show Cause Deadline set for 8/15/2012. The Clerk shall transmit a copy of this order to Gregory K. Garland at his last known address. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copy mailed as directed) (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ribeiro et al v. Baby Trend, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baby Trend, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Ribeiro
Represented By: Michael F. Coyle
Represented By: Gregory K. Garland
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franco Ribeiro
Represented By: Michael F. Coyle
Represented By: Gregory K. Garland
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?