AXIS Capital, Inc. v. Augustyniak Insurance Group et al
Plaintiff: AXIS Capital, Inc.
Defendant: Michael E. Augustyniak and Augustyniak Insurance Group
Counter Defendant: AXIS Capital, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Michael E. Augustyniak and Augustyniak Insurance Group
Case Number: 8:2012cv00224
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 JUDGMENT, pursuant to the 58 Stipulation for Dismissal, that this action, including all claims and counterclaims, is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Withdraw Matthew W. Sparks as Attorney for Defendants Michael E. Augustyniak and Augustyniak Insurance Group, Inc. On or before August 8, 2013, Defendant Michael E. Augustyniak shall either: (a) obtain the services o f counsel and have that attorney file an appearance in this case; or (b) file a statement notifying the court of his intent to litigate this case without the assistance of counsel. Defendant Augustyniak Insurance Group, Inc., a corporation, cannot litigate its action in this forum without representation by licensed counsel. On or before August 8, 2013, Defendant Augustyniak Insurance Group, Inc. shall obtain the services of counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on its behalf, in the absence of which the court may file an entry and/or judgment of default against it without further notice. Matthew W. Sparks shall promptly mail a copy of this order to Defendants Michael E. Augustyniak and Augustyniak Insurance Group, Inc., and file a certificate of service stating the date and the manner of service, and the name and address served. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' discovery requests is continued until further order of the court. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 37 is continued until further order of the court. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JSF)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that the 24 Stipulation, treated as an unopposed motion for enlargement of time, is granted; Defendants shall have until November 13, 2012, to respond to Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB, )
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER per 16 Notice of Related Case, Case No. 8:12CV227, Axis Capital, Inc. v. Groninger Insurance Agency, LLC, et al., is reassigned to Senior District Judge Richard G. Kopf for disposition and to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AXIS Capital, Inc. v. Augustyniak Insurance Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: AXIS Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Russell A. Westerhold
Represented By: Robert W. Futhey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXIS Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Russell A. Westerhold
Represented By: Robert W. Futhey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Michael E. Augustyniak
Represented By: Matthew W. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Augustyniak Insurance Group
Represented By: Matthew W. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E. Augustyniak
Represented By: Matthew W. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augustyniak Insurance Group
Represented By: Matthew W. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?