Mumin v. Mayo et al
Plaintiff: Dukhan Iqraa Jihad Mumin
Defendant: Mayo, Eric Miller, Cronin, Lancaster County Attorney, Lancaster County Sheriff's Office and Lincoln Police Department
Case Number: 8:2012cv00313
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Lancaster County Defendants' Motion to Lift Stay and Reinstate Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 34 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The clerk's office is directed to reopen this case. Defendants have 21 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The clerk's office is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: December 1, 2014: Check for answer or other r esponse to amended complaint. Plaintiff's Motion in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 36 ) is denied as moot. The clerk's office is directed to update the court's records to reflect that Filing Number 17 is Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF RECUSAL - REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT - The undersigned recuses herself from this matter. The Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse (Filing No. 37 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - Plaintiff's Request for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint (filing 26 ) is denied. Defendants' Objection to Request for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint (filing 28 ) is sustained. This case shall remain administratively c losed as previously ordered. By June 17, 2014, Plaintiff must file a written status report detailing the status of the state court appeal. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a case management deadline in this case using the following text: June 17, 2014 - deadline for Plaintiff to file written status report. Plaintiff shall notify the Court, in writing, whether he would like to reopen this matter within thirty days after the state court appeal is resolved. Plaintiff is warned that if he fails to move to reopen this matter, as directed by the Court, the Court may decline to reopen this matter and enter judgment against him for failing to follow this Court's orders. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider (Filing No. 24 ) is denied. Plaintiff is directed to file a second written status report no later than March 17, 2014, advising the court about the status of his state court criminal p roceeding. If Plaintiff's state-court appeal is resolved before March 17, 2014, Plaintiff shall notify the court, in writing, whether he would like to reopen this matter within 30 days after the appeal is resolved. The court warns Plaintiff that if he fails to move to reopen this matter, in accordance with this Memorandum and Order, the court may decline to reopen this matter and enter judgment against him for failing to follow this court's orders. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: March 17, 2014: deadline for Plaintiff to file second written status report. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend (filing no. 17 ) is granted. The County Defendants' original Motion to Dismiss (filing no. 10 ) and the City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (filing no. 14 ) are denied as moot. This matter is stayed until Plaintiff's state court criminal proceeding, Nebraska v. Mumin, Case No. CR11-954, and any appeal therefrom, is resolved. The Clerk of the court is directed to administratively close this case. Plaintiff mu st file a written status report no later than September 23, 2013, advising the court about the status of his state court criminal proceeding. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the follow ing text: September 23, 2013: deadline for Plaintiff to file written status report. Plaintiff shall notify the court, in writing, whether he would like to reopen this matter within 30 days after the pending criminal proceeding, and any appeal ther efrom, is resolved. The court warns Plaintiff that if he fails to move to reopen this matter, in accordance with this Memorandum and Order, the court may decline to reopen this matter and enter judgement against him for failing to follow this cour t's orders. The County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is denied without prejudice to reassertion if Plaintiff moves to reopen the case. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Filing No. 5 ) is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mumin v. Mayo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo
Represented By: Michael E. Thew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Miller
Represented By: Michael E. Thew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cronin
Represented By: Tonya L. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster County Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Police Department
Represented By: Tonya L. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dukhan Iqraa Jihad Mumin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?