Jo v. Six Unknown Names Agents et al
Plaintiff: Young Yil Jo
Defendant: Barack Obama and Six Unknown Names Agents
Case Number: 8:2012cv00333
Filed: September 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION - Plaintiff has not paid the filing fee and has not submitted a certified trust account statement. (See Docket Sheet.) Accordingly, this matter will be dismissed. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until January 4, 2013, to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee or submit a certified trust account statement in support of his Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. In the event that plaintiff fails to com ply with this Memorandum and Order, this matter will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: January 4, 2013: Check for institutional trust account statement. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG, )
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the complaint on or before October 25, 2012. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: October 25, 2012: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jo v. Six Unknown Names Agents et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Young Yil Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barack Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Unknown Names Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?