Johnson v. Millard Public School
Plaintiff: Michael Johnson
Defendant: Millard Public School
Case Number: 8:2012cv00372
Filed: October 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Johnson's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice because it fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON INITIAL REVIEW - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Johnson shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a copy of his NEOC right-to-sue notice with the court. If Johnson did file suit within 90 days of his receipt of the right-to-sue notice, he need only file a copy of the notice in order to comply with this memorandum and order. However, if Johnson did not file suit within 90 days of his receipt of the right-to-sue notice, Johnson must also show that equitabl e or exceptional circumstances exist that warrant tolling of the 90- day period. This matter will be dismissed without further notice if the plaintiff, Michael Johnson, fails to comply with this memorandum and order. The clerk's office is dir ected to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 11, 2013: Check for filing of NEOC notice and showing of cause (if applicable). I reserve the right to conduct further review of Johnson's claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) after Johnson addresses the matter set forth in this memorandum and order. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COST - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Millard Public School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millard Public School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?