Osborn et al v. Pathology Services, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Mitchel Osborn and Rayleen A. Osborn
Defendant: Pathology Services, P.C. and Byron L. Barksdale
Case Number: 8:2012cv00374
Filed: October 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Legal Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 52 Stipulation for Dismissal. This action is dismissed with prejudice to the filing of any future action, each party to pay its own costs. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER that on or before February 28, 2014, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal; the previously scheduled trial is cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled; the pending 45 Motion in Limine and 35 Motion in Limine are terminated as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the 19 Motion to Extend is granted to the extent the planning conference scheduled for April 12, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. (Filing No. 9 - Order paragraph 8) is cancelled. Planning Conference rescheduled for 7/12/2013 at 09:30 AM by telep hone before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Counsel for the plaintiffs shall initiate the call with participating counsel and the undersigned magistrate judge. The remaining deadlines for final progression will be scheduled during the July 12, 2013, planning conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osborn et al v. Pathology Services, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchel Osborn
Represented By: E. Terry Sibbernsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayleen A. Osborn
Represented By: E. Terry Sibbernsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pathology Services, P.C.
Represented By: William M. Lamson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron L. Barksdale
Represented By: William M. Lamson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?