Gilliland et al v. Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Luis S. Gallegos, Denise M. Gilliland and Terrence N. Gilliland
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC
Case Number: 8:2012cv00384
Filed: October 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Court on the Plaintiffs' Motion for Evidentiary Hearing (Filing No. 169 ) is granted in part, in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER that Earl G. Greene, III, is stricken as an attorney of record for the defendant. Said attorney may apply to be readmitted as an attorney of record only after paying the 2015/2016 attorney assessment fee, as required by NEGenR 1.7(h). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MBM)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER - On or before June 15, 2015, attorney Earl G. Greene, III, shall pay the assessment or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the court. Failure to comply with this order will result in the court removing Mr. Greene as counsel of record for the defendant. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine 130 is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant Harley-Davidson's Motion in Limine No. 4 To Exclude Evidence of Dissimilar Accidents or Incidents 132 is granted. Defendant Harl ey-Davidson's Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff Denise Gilliland's Cancer 133 is denied, without prejudice to Harley-Davidson asserting its objections at the time of trial. Defendant Harley-Davidson's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Harley-Davidson's Customer Contacts and Warranty Claims 134 is granted, provided that Plaintiffs may request an evidentiary hearing outside the presence of the jury to determine the admissibility of such evi dence. Defendant Harley-Davidson's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude any Evidence of Harley-Davidson Service Bulletin M-1215, M1215A and M-1215B 136 is granted, provided that Plaintiffs may request an evidentiary hearing outside the presence o f the jury to determine the admissibility of such evidence. Defendant Harley-Davidson's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiffs' Hearsay Statements 138 is granted. Defendant Harley-Davidson's Request for Oral Argument on Motions in Limine 140 is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER denying 143 Motion to Amend to Request an Award of Punitive Damages. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 AMENDED ORDER - This matter is before the court sua sponte. The remaining deadlines, pretrial conference, and trial previously scheduled are continued. Final Pretrial Conference with the undersigned magistrate judge is set for March 20, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. in chambers, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Trial is set to commence, at the court's call, during the week of April 21, 2015, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Laurie Smith Camp and a jury. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JAB) Modified on 1/13/2015 (JAB)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER - The Motion to Exclude Any Testimony or Evidence Relating to the Pinch Bolts on the Subject Motorcycle 101 filed by Defendant Harley Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC ("Harley-Davidson") is denied, without prejudice to Defendant& #039;s assertion of objections at trial; The Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness James M. Weaver, P.E. 103 filed by Harley-Davidson is denied; The Motion for Summary Judgment 94 filed by Harley-Davidson is denied; and The Motion for Hearing and Request for Oral Argument on Pending Motions 114 filed by Harley-Davidson is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (SLP)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER OF RECUSAL - REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT This matter is before the court on the court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a), which states: Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify himself in any proceeding in which his impartiality might reasonably be questioned. Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse himself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a). Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (GJG)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE granting 80 Motion to Extend. Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2015 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial set to commence, at the court's call, during the week of 2/17/2015 in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the plaintiffs' appeal (Filing No. 62) of the magistrate's order is granted in part and denied in part. The magistrate judge's order (Filing No. 58) is reversed in part and sustained in part. The plaintif fs' motion to amend the progression order (Filing No. 49) is granted. The plaintiffs' motion for sanctions (Filing No. 49) is denied. The plaintiffs' motion and amended motion for a continuance of the trial (Filing Nos. 64 and 66) are granted. The magistrate judge is directed to enter an amended progression order in conformity with this Memorandum and Order. The defendant's motion to exclude testimony regarding pinch bolts, Filing No. 32; defendant's motion to e xclude the testimony of plaintiffs' expert witness Chris Hoffman, Filing No. 34; defendant's motion for summary judgment, Filing No. 36; and defendant's motion to exclude the testimony of plaintiffs' expert witness James M. Weaver, P.E., Filing No. 40, are denied as moot without prejudice to refiling. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER that the defendant's Motion to Require Parties to Designate Discovery Testimony and Discovery Responses to be Used at Trial 57 is granted. The plaintiffs' Objection 59 is overruled. The parties shall have to on or before March 7, 2014, to designate discovery testimony and discovery responses to be used at trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Extend. The deadline for filing motions for summary judgment is extended from October 31, 2013, to December 17, 2013. All depositions, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by February 3, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER pursuant to stipulation by the parties.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilliland et al v. Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis S. Gallegos
Represented By: Steven H. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise M. Gilliland
Represented By: Steven H. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence N. Gilliland
Represented By: Steven H. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC
Represented By: Historic Inns of Court Building
Represented By: David M. Woodke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?