Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Colony National Insurance Company et al

Defendant: American Home Assurance Company, Colony National Insurance Company and Deangelo Brothers
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2013cv00084
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2016 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant American Home Assurance Company's Motion to Withdraw Appearance and Substitute Counsel (Filing No. 134 ) is granted. The law firm of Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti LLP is hereby substituted for Greenberg Tra urig LLP as counsel for Defendant American Home Assurance Company. Joel Max Eads and the law firm of Greenberg Traurig LLP are granted leave to withdraw. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the appearance of Mr. Eads as counsel for American Home Assurance Company and terminate future notices to Mr. Eads in this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
September 9, 2016 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Colony National Insurance Company's Motion to Compel (Filing No. 90 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
May 17, 2016 129 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' proposed progression schedule is adopted per this order. In particular, the Pretrial Conference is set for 10/16/2017 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before the magistrate judge. The Jury Trial is set for 11/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
April 27, 2016 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties are to meet and confer and submit a proposed progression order to this court on or before May 13, 2016. Any briefs and evidence in opposition to Colony National Insurance Company's Motion to Compel (Filing No. 90 ) shall be filed on or before May 16, 2016. Colony may file a reply brief and index of evidence within seven (7) days after the filing and service of any brief in opposition. See NECivR 7.1. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
April 26, 2016 124 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Filing No. 100 ) submitted by Defendant Colony National Insurance Co. is granted in part as follows: Defendants' liability to Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company is limited by the scope of the indemnity clause in the 2005 Agreement between Plaintiff and Defendant DeAngelo Brothers, Inc. The Motion is otherwise denied. The Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Filing No. 103 ) submitted by Defendant American Home Assur ance Company is granted. The Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Filing No. 104 ) submitted by Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company is denied. The stay of discovery (Filing No. 95 ) is lifted. Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett may issue a new order progressing the case. The Motion for Leave to File Clarification Re: Oral Argument (Filing No. 123 ) submitted by Colony National Insurance Company is denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
November 16, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CROSS-MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT that all discovery is this matter is temporarily stayed until the resolution of the parties' anticipated cross-motions for partial summary judgm ent. The deadline for the parties to file their respective motions for partial summary judgment is December 15, 2015. The deadline for submitting a brief in opposition to a motion for partial summary judgment is February 1, 2016. The deadline for the movants to file reply briefs in support of their respective motions for partial summary judgment is February 15, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
September 24, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING R.26 PLANNING REPORT DEADLINES, granting 88 Motion to Extend. The requested deadlines are extended as set out in this order. The telephonic R.16 planning conference remains scheduled for 11/9/2015 at 10:30 A.M. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
July 10, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order 83 , it is ordered that the motion is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (SLP)
June 15, 2015 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order. If desired, the parties may, consistent with the rulings herein, confer and jointly submit a stipulated protective order for entry by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (SLP)
January 2, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the appearance of Gage Cobb as counsel of record for Plaintiff and shall terminate future notices to Mr. Cobb in this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Colony National Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: William H. Selde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colony National Insurance Company
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deangelo Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Gage R. Cobb
Represented By: Anne M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?