Design Basics, LLC v. Carhart Lumber Company et al

Defendant: Brenda Kuhlman Carhart, William C. Carhart, Carhart Lumber Company, Scott Brian Carthart and Michael Herbolsheimer
Plaintiff: Design Bascis, LLC
Case Number: 8:2013cv00125
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2016 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the defendants' 91 Motion to Reconsider Memorandum and Order doc # 86 . Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
February 3, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Defendants' motion for summary judgment on its statute-of-limitationsdefense (Filing 62 ) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth within the order. Defendants' motion to strike (Filing 78 ) the declarati on of Carl Cuozzo (Filing 73 , Ex. A) is denied. Plaintiff's statement of objections (Filing 80 ) to Magistrate Judge Zwart's order denying Plaintiff leave to amend its complaint is denied, and the Magistrate Judges order entered on October 16, 2015, (Filing 76 ) is sustained and shall not be disturbed. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
October 16, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Motion for Leave to amend. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
September 24, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER granting 65 Joint Motion to Continue. 1) Jury Trial continued to 2/8/2016 at 09:00 AM Courtroom 1 (Special Proceedings), Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Rich ard G. Kopf.2) Pretrial Conference continued to 1/26/2016 at 01:00 PM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. A separate order will be filed with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx.3) Motions for summary judgment or other dispositive motions shall be filed by October 19, 2016.4) No further continuances will granted absent a substantial showing of good cause. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
January 26, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Plaintiff's Statement of Objections to Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Order 49 is denied; and The Magistrate Judges Memorandum and Order (Filing 48 ) denying Plaintiffs motion to compel discovery (Filing 31 ) and granting Defendants motion for protective order (Filing 34 ) shall not be disturbed and is hereby sustained. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
November 24, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion to Compel; granting 34 Motion for Protective Order. On or before January 5, 2015, the parties shall confer, complete and file the attached abbreviated Rule 26(f) Report. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
May 27, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Attorney Dana LeJune has a pending case in this court and has not paid the 2013/2014 Attorney Assessment. Within 30 days from the date of this order, Attorney LeJune is directed to pay the $20.00 fee or show cause why the fee cannot be paid. Show Cause Deadline set for 6/27/2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MTB)
September 3, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Email Motion. --The mandatory disclosure deadline is extended to September 17, 2013. --Electronic discovery shall be conducted in accordance with the attached order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
July 16, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER- The parties' Joint Motion 7 is granted and a protective order is entered. In accordance with Rule 502(d) and (e) of the Federal Rules of Evidence and the authority granted therein, the terms of the parties' discovery agreement are hereby ordered and enforceable against the parties herein and all persons in federal and state proceedings, including third parties. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Design Basics, LLC v. Carhart Lumber Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Kuhlman Carhart
Represented By: David S. Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C. Carhart
Represented By: David S. Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carhart Lumber Company
Represented By: David S. Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Brian Carthart
Represented By: David S. Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Herbolsheimer
Represented By: David S. Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Design Bascis, LLC
Represented By: Dana A. LeJune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?