State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. et al

Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America and Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 8:2013cv00138
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 68 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (SMN)
August 19, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this matter is before the court upon the defendant's, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. (TAIS), submission of documents (the Quanta documents) for in camera review in accordance with the court's August 11, 2015, Order [62 ]. Upon review of the redacted Quanta documents, the court finds the redactions are appropriate and orders TAIS to produce such redacted documents to the defendant, Matsushita Electric Industrial Company, Co. Ltd., on or before August 28, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
August 11, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Matsushita's Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery to the extent TAIS shall provide a redacted version of the Quanta documents and denied in all other respects. TAIS shall submit a redacted version of the Quanta documents to the undersigned magistrate judge on or before August 18, 2015. Following the court's review, the court will order TAIS to provide Matsushita the Quanta documents. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
June 19, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - On or before September 4, 2015, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a status report regarding the success of a meditation session. The matter shall not be stayed pending mediation. ( Status Report due by 9/4/2015.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
September 13, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Stipulation for Dismissal. The above-captioned cause is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant Panasonic Corporation of North America with each party to bear its own costs. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Represented By: Jonathan T. Barton
Represented By: Jennifer D. Tricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Degan
Represented By: Mark D. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?