Bernbeck v. Gale et al
Plaintiff: |
Kent Bernbeck |
Defendant: |
John A. Gale and Charlotte TeBrink |
Case Number: |
8:2013cv00228 |
Filed: |
July 30, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas D. Thalken |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Voting |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 15, 2016 |
Filing
87
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment claim, as discussed in Filing No. 82 , is dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
|
April 8, 2015 |
Filing
73
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees 62 is granted in part and denied in part as follows: The Court awards plaintiff $87,915.00 in attorneys' fees and $561.54 in costs. In all other respects the motion is denied. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this memorandum and order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
|
November 10, 2014 |
Filing
61
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court finds the distribution requirement set forth in the Neb. Const., art. III, §§ 2 and 4 unconstitutional under the Fourteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution. The court issues a permanent i njunction enjoining the defendant from enforcing the distribution requirement in Neb. Const., art. III, §§ 2 and 4. The plaintiff has 30 days from the date of this order to file a properly supported motion for costs and attorney fees. Thereafter, the defendant shall have 30 days to respond, and the plaintiff shall have 7 days to file a reply brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
|
September 11, 2014 |
Filing
59
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants objections, Filing No. 51 , to written evidentiary materials are granted and denied as set forth herein. Plaintiff's objections to written evidentiary materials, Filing No. 52 , are denied at this time. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
|
March 6, 2014 |
Filing
47
ORDER that this matter is before the court following a telephone planning conference with counsel on March 6, 2014. The parties agreed this matter can be submitted for a decision on a stipulated record with written briefs and arguments from the parties. Deadlines set forth in the order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
|
February 19, 2014 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendant TeBrink's motion for summary judgment 24 is granted and she is dismissed from this case. The motions for summary judgment 24 and 27 are granted with regard to the issue of paid circulators. Defendant Gal e's motion for summary judgment against plaintiff for the residency requirements 27 is denied. The defendants' objection to indices 40 and 42 are denied. The magistrate judge is ordered to progress this case either to trial or schedule deadlines for cross-motions for summary judgments as to the merits of the residency requirement. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?