Carroll v. Colvin
Plaintiff: John W. Carroll
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2013cv00255
Filed: August 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- The Commissioner's decision is affirmed; The appeal is denied; and Judgment in favor of the defendant will be entered in a separate document. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER- The Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Brief, ECF No. 21 , is granted; the defendant shall have on or before May 7, 2014, in which to file and serve her response to the plaintiff' ;s brief; within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief ; and the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (MKR)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - The plaintiff's Unresisted Motion for Enlargement of Time, ECF No. 16 , is granted; the plaintiff shall on or before January 31, 2014, file and serve his brief in support of his position; the defendant shall have 35 days from th e date on which the plaintiff's brief is filed in which to file an answer brief; within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file a reply brief and make any other request which may be permitted under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); and in the absence of an order scheduling further proceedings, the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 4. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (MKR)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting the Defendant's 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The defendant shall have on or before November 25, 2013, in which to file and serve her answer. ***Reset All Deadlines: Carolyn W. Colvin 11/25/2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (MKR)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting the MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John W. Carroll. The clerk of the court shall send three summons forms and three USM-285 forms to Carroll for service of process on the United States. Federal Rule of Ci vil Procedure 4(m) requires service of process by no later than 120 days after the filing of a civil complaint; Upon receipt of the completed summons forms and USM-285 forms, the clerk of court shall sign the summonses and forward them, together wit h copies of the complaint, to the U.S. Marshal for service on the United States; and The U.S. Marshal shall serve the United States, without payment of costs or fees. Service shall be effected pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) regarding "[s]erving the United States and Its Agencies, Corporations, Officers, or Employees."Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (three USM-285 forms and three summons mailed to Plaintiff Carroll)(MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Carroll
Represented By: Gregory W. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?