Brown v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Antonisha Brown
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2013cv00266
Filed: August 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Commissioner's decision is affirmed. The appeal is denied; and Judgment in favor of the defendant will be entered in a separate document. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - IT THEREFORE IS ORDERED that: 1. the defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. 17, is granted; 2. the defendant shall have on or before March 24, 2014, in which to file and serve her response to the plaintiff's b rief; 3. within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief ; and 4. the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (TCL )
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEF DEADLINE - IT THEREFORE IS ORDERED that: 1. the plaintiff's Motion to Extend Brief Deadline, ECF No. 14, is granted; 2. the plaintiff shall have on or before January 17, 2014, in which to file and serve her brie f; 3. the defendant shall have 35 days from the date on which the plaintiff's brief is filed in which to file an answer brief; 4. within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file a reply brief and either party may request oral argument or make any other request which may be permitted under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); and 5. the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 4 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (TCL )
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting the 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk of the court shall send three summons forms and three USM-285 forms to Brown for service of process on the United States. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) require s service of process by no later than 120 days after the filing of a civil complaint; Brown shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms (see attached Notice for persons to be served) and send the completed summonses and USM-285 forms back to t he clerk of the court. In the absence of those forms, service of process cannot occur. Upon receipt of the completed summons forms and USM-285 forms, the clerk of court shall sign the summonses and forward them, together with copies of the compl aint, to the U.S. Marshal for service on the United States; and the U.S. Marshal shall serve the United States, without payment of costs or fees. Service shall be effected pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 (i) regarding "[s]erving the United States and Its Agencies, Corporations, Officers, or Employees." Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (3 Summons/USM-285 forms mailed to counsel for the plaintiff)(MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonisha Brown
Represented By: Philip S. Martin
Represented By: Sean D. Cuddigan
Represented By: Timothy J. Cuddigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?