First Dakota National Bank v. Eco Energy, LLC
Plaintiff: First Dakota National Bank
Defendant: Eco Energy, LLC
Case Number: 8:2013cv00270
Filed: August 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER that counsel for plaintiff and defendant shall either withdraw the following exhibits previously submitted from Non-Jury Trial held on 8/24/2015 and 8/25/2015 in this matter within 14 calendar days of the date of this order or show cause why t he exhibits should not be destroyed. If counsel fails to withdraw the exhibits as directed or to show cause why the exhibits should not be destroyed, the clerk's office is directed to destroy the listed exhibits without further notice to the parties or order from the court. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KMM)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW that the plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. A separate judgment will be entered in favor of the defendant. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting parties' 55 Stipulation. The non-jury trial of this case is set to commence before John M. Gerrard, United States District Judge, in the Special Proceedings Courtroom, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Pla za, Omaha, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on August 24, 2015, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of three (3) trial days. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER - After conferring with counsel today regarding setting the case for trial, IT IS ORDERED the defendant's anticipated motion to conduct discovery out of time shall be filed on or before February 6, 2015. After the court resolves that issue, an additional conference call will be set to determine the progression schedule for final resolution of this lawsuit. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - First Dakota's motion for summary judgment (filing 33 ) is denied. Eco Energy's motion for summary judgment (filing 37 ) is granted in part and denied in part, as set forth above. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - After conferring with counsel:1) Or before July 8, 2014, the defendant shall file its anticipated summary judgment motion, along with its response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, (Filing No. 33 ).2) On or before August 5, 2014, the plaintiff shall file its response to Defendant's anticipated summary judgment motion, along with any reply in support of Plaintiff's summary judgment motion, (Filing No. 33 ).3) On or before August 19, 2014, the defendant shall file any reply in support of its summary judgment motion.4) The pretrial conference and trial are continued pending further order of the court.5) If this case is not fully resolved on summary judgment, within ten days following the court's ruling on the dispositive motions, counsel shall contact my chambers to set a telephonic conference on re-scheduling the case for trial.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Dakota National Bank v. Eco Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eco Energy, LLC
Represented By: James J. Frost
Represented By: Douglas E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Dakota National Bank
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?