Williams et al v. Feeney et al
Plaintiff: Annie Gibbs, Olin B. Kicklighter and Hope K. Williams
Defendant: Martin Feeney, Feeney Xpress Transport, Bary Franklin and Ranchero, LLC
Case Number: 8:2013cv00287
Filed: September 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER AND JUDGMENT - The stipulation of the parties 157 is approved and adopted. The motion for judgment of dismissal 151 is granted. Plaintiff's third amended original complaint and all causes of action stated therein against the defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER - The Court approves and adopts the parties' joint stipulation (Filing No. 102 ) to the extent the Ranchero Defendants' withdraw their motion (Filing No. 95 ). The motion (Filing No. 95 ) is deemed withdrawn. Defendant's moti on (Filing No. 97 ) to seal unredacted document (Filing No. 96-1) is granted. Defendant's motion (Filing No. 97 ) to substitute and replace the Index of Evidence and Affidavit of Randall L. Goyette (Filing No. 96-1) with the Affidavit of Randall L. Goyette (Filing No. 91-1) is denied as moot. The parties' joint stipulation (Filing No. 101 ) is deemed moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER - The request for expedited hearing and oral argument, 124 was granted. A further telephonic conference with the undersigned is scheduled for: Monday, April 27, 2015, at 9 a.m. (CDT) to further discuss whether the trial will be rescheduled. The call will be initiated by Chambers. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant Ranchero's motion (Filing No. 110 ) to compel discovery is granted. Plaintiff shall produce the documents in question on or before April 27, 2015. The defendants' joint motion (Filing No. 113 ) to continue trial is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER- This matter is before the court on the Defendant's Unopposed Joint Motion for Continuance 91 . Jury Trial set for 5/18/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2015 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR, )
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 77 Motion to Extend Daubert motion deadline. The parties shall have until October 1, 2014, to file motions concerning the qualifications of an expert or the admissibility of testimony of an expert witness. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KMG)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Filing No. 59 is denied without prejudice. Filing No. 62 is granted. The statement of Feeney and the notes of Jeff White need not be furnished to plaintiff. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER - Defendants' motion is granted. Defendants shall have until April 1, 2014, to file their brief in opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER - Plaintiffs' motion to remove George S. Bellas as counsel of record is granted. The clerk of court shall remove said counsel from the CM/ECF system. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2013 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER - The motion of D. William Porter to withdraw as counsel for defendants Martin Feeney and Feeney Xpress Transport, Inc. is granted. The clerk of court shall remove said counsel from the CM/ECF system. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - The motion 29 of Ted L. Perryman and Jason D. Guerra of Roberts Perryman, P.C., to withdraw as counsel for defendants Ranchero, LLC and Bary Franklin is granted. The clerk of court shall remove said counsel from the CM/ECF system. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 09/12/2013. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendants Franklin and Ranchero 6 & 7 are DENIED AS MOOT, and the Motion to Transfer Case by Defendant Martin Feeney 10 is GRANTED. This matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a).(JS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 9/13/2013.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Feeney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Feeney
Represented By: Matthew D. Hammes
Represented By: Patrick V. Ortman
Represented By: David W. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feeney Xpress Transport
Represented By: Matthew D. Hammes
Represented By: Patrick V. Ortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bary Franklin
Represented By: Stephen S. Gealy
Represented By: Jason D. Guerra
Represented By: Ted L. Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranchero, LLC
Represented By: Stephen S. Gealy
Represented By: Jason D. Guerra
Represented By: Ted L. Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Gibbs
Represented By: George S. Bellas
Represented By: Matthew S. Finkelstein
Represented By: James H. Hada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olin B. Kicklighter
Represented By: George S. Bellas
Represented By: Matthew S. Finkelstein
Represented By: James H. Hada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope K. Williams
Represented By: George S. Bellas
Represented By: Maren L. Chaloupka
Represented By: Matthew S. Finkelstein
Represented By: James H. Hada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?