Ledesma et al v. Brahmer et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Ledesma and Ricardo Osorio
Defendant: Richard Brahmer
Case Number: 8:2013cv00310
Filed: October 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 106 Stipulation for Dismissal. This case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees, and complete record is waived. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: On or before June 19, 2015, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscour ts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT: Defendant's motion in limine, Filing No. 73 , is granted in part and denied in part as set forth herein. Plaintiff's motions in limine, Filing No. 75 and Filing No. 79 , are granted in part and denied in part as set forth herein. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 52 Motion to Strike Third-Party Petition. Osorio's Third-Party Petition (Filing No. 50 ) is hereby stricken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KMG)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER that Mr. Okolo's Motion to Withdraw 45 is granted. Mr. Okolo is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Ricardo Osorio. Mr. Okolo remains as counsel for the plaintiff Antonio Ledesma. In light of Osorio's filing, Mr. Okolo does not need to file a notice in compliance with paragraph four of the court's January 21, 2015, Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that Mr. Okolo's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney is held in abeyance. Osorio shall have until 3/6/15 to respond to the motion to withdraw by filing a brief with the Clerk of Court. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to Ricardo Osorio, 806 Powder Horn Drive, Smyrna, TN 37167. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed as directed) (JSF)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment (Filing No. 28 ) is denied. Defendant/counterclaimant's motion for partial summary judgment (Filing No. 29 ) is granted with respect to Ricardo Osorio's lo ss of consortium claim and attorney fees claim and denied in all other respects, consistent with this opinion. Plaintiff/counterclaim defendant Ricardo Osorio's loss of consortium action is dismissed. Defendant/counterclaimant's motion in limine (Filing No. 37 ) is denied. Within (10) days of the date of this order, counsel for the plaintiffs shall contact the chambers of the United States Magistrate Judge Thomas Thalken to schedule a telephone planning conference for progression of this case. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledesma et al v. Brahmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Brahmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Ledesma
Represented By: Jerome C. Okolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Osorio
Represented By: Jerome C. Okolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?