Brown v. Bruns et al
Plaintiff: Ira Brown
Defendant: Phyllis Bruns, Eric Ander and U.S.P.S.
Case Number: 8:2013cv00318
Filed: October 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Title VII and PRA claims are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's Rehabilitation Act claim may proceed to service. Plaintiff must complete and return the summons forms which the Clerk will provide. The Clerk shall send 3 summons and 3 USM-285 forms to Plaintiff together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. The Clerk is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: "July 2, 2014: Check for completion of service of summons."Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms as directed) (JSF)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Extend (filing no. 8 ) is denied. Plaintiff shall have until February 21, 2014, to amend his Complaint in accordance with the courts December 2, 2013, Memorandum and Order. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 2/21/2014:check for amendedcomplaint.) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff shall have until 1/2/14 to amend his complaint. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline for 1/2/2014: Check for amended complaint. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Bruns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Ander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.P.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?