Oriental Trading Company, Inc. et al v. Yagoozon, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fun Express and Oriental Trading Company, Inc.
Defendant: Yagoozon, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2013cv00351
Filed: November 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER TO DESTROY EXHIBITS. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER and JUDGMENT - The stipulated motion is granted; this action is dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs' partial motion for summary judgment as to Set One is denied. Plaintiffs' partial motion for summary judgment as to Set Two is denied. Plaintiffs' partial motion for summary judgment as to defendant's affirmative defenses is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER - The motion 137 is granted; plaintiffs shall have until April 6, 2016, to file their final reply brief in support of their second summary judgment motion. Any remaining deadlines are held in abeyance until ruling has been made on any pending summary judgment motions. Thereafter a planning conference will be scheduled with counsel to complete a new progression schedule for this case. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's motion to enforce settlement 123 is denied. On or before March 31, 2016, the parties shall submit a joint proposal for progression of the case for purposes of discovery and trial. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 131 Motion to Stay. All case deadlines are stayed pending resolution of the motion to enforce settlement. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 4th AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting the parties' Joint 121 Motion to Extend Progression Order. An evidentiary hearing pursuant to Rule 104 of the Federal Rules of Evidence with respect to defendant's expert Janet Labenz is re-s cheduled for 3/7/2016 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Jury Trial set for 4/25/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2016 at 10:00 AM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER - Plaintiffs' motion for an evidentiary hearing pursuant to Rule 104 of the Federal Rules of Evidence with respect to defendants expert Janet Labenz, filing 113 , is granted. The hearing is scheduled for: Tuesday, January 12, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom No. 5, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 88 Motion to Seal. Plaintiffs may file their Daubert motion, with supporting brief and evidence, under seal, pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KLF)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER that the Motion 72 is granted; the discovery deadline is extended to December 2, 2015. All motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before December 2, 2015. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER - Plaintiffs' motion 62 is granted. Plaintiffs may file their motion for partial summary judgment, brief and supporting evidence under seal, pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 3rd AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The parties' 57 JOINT MOTION to Extend Progression Order is granted. Jury Trial rescheduled for 2/8/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2016 at 10:00 AM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 2nd AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER- This matter is before the court on the parties' Stipulated Motion to Extend Progression Order 52 . ( Jury Trial set for 11/2/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. and Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2015 at 11:00 AM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart). Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiffs' motion (Filing No. 36 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The Court accepts as waived plaintiffs' motion as to Request for Production No. 12. The defendant will produce all documents currentl y in its possession and will demand that Amazon produce all documents to the plaintiffs in its possession, in response to Request for Production Nos. 13, 14, 15, 16, 18, 19, 20, and 22. The defendant will produce all documents currently in its posse ssion in response to Request for Production No. 24. The plaintiffs' request for sanctions is denied without prejudice. The defendant's request that the plaintiffs pay for its discovery expenses (Filing No. 40 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting the parties' Joint 39 Motion to Extend. Jury Trial set for 7/6/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2015 at 11:00 AM by WebEx before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - Plaintiffs' motion 31 is granted. Plaintiffs shall have until September 2, 2014, to file their second amended complaint. Defendant shall have until September 22, 2014, to answer or otherwise respond. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - Plaintiffs' motion, filing 19 , is granted; plaintiffs shall have until February 28, 2014, to file their amended complaint. Defendant shall have until March 14, 2014, to answer or otherwise respond. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2014 09:00 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse herself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oriental Trading Company, Inc. et al v. Yagoozon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fun Express
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oriental Trading Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yagoozon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?