Garten v. Keith County Attorney's Office et al
Plaintiff: Charles Garten
Defendant: Nebraska DHHS, Yuri Manzanares, Keith County CASA, Keith County Attorney's Office, Mary Cummings, Ogallala Police Dept. and Sharon Ott
Case Number: 8:2014cv00024
Filed: January 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motions seeking the appointment of counsel 20 and the production of documents 21 are denied. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. Failure to comply as directed will result in dismissal of this case for want of prosecution pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The clerk's office is directed to mail to Plaintiff a copy of the court's Memorandum and Orde r dated July 18, 2014, together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: September 8, 2014: check for amended complaint; dismiss if none.Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed) (JSF)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's claims for injunctive relief are dismissed. Plaintiff will have 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to amend his Complaint to set forth the grounds for the court's jurisdiction and to clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against Defendants in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: July 21, 2014: deadline for Plaintiff to amend. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Charles Garten shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $24.31 by 3/3/14, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. T he Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. Letter sent to Iowa Medical and Classification Center, Attn: Financial Department, 2700 Coral Ridge Avenue, Coralville, IA 52241. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 3/3/2014. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copies mailed as directed and to pro se party) (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garten v. Keith County Attorney's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska DHHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuri Manzanares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith County CASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith County Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogallala Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Garten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?