Schomburg v. John Henry's Plumbing Co.
Plaintiff: Jessica M Schomburg
Defendant: John Henry's Plumbing Co.
Case Number: 8:2014cv00072
Filed: March 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, ECF No. 69 , is approved. The above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice. Any pending motions are terminated. The Court will not assess costs or attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER AMENDING TRIAL DATE, granting 62 Motion to Continue. Motions in limine due 2/15/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2017 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before the assigned magistrate judge. Jury Trial set for 8/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER AMENDING TRIAL DATE, granting 59 Motion to Continue Trial Date. The Pretrial Conference is set for 2/3/2017 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 2/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER AMENDING PROGRESSION SCHEDULE, granting 52 the Joint Motion to Continue. Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2016 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 12/20/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that fact discovery limited to the allegations of spoliation shall be completed by May 6, 2016. Motions for summary judgment shall be filed by May 20, 2016. Motions in limine shall be filed by June 17, 2016. A Pretrial Conference before the und ersigned will be held July 15, 2016, at 9:30 a.m., in chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2210, Roman L. Hruska Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. Trial is set to commence, at the Courts call, during the week of August 16, 2016, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Laurie Smith Camp, Chief United States District Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KLF)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 THIRD AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 30 Joint Motion to Continue. Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2016 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 5/17/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 28 Joint Motion to Continue. Depositions due 8/31/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2016 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 2/16/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 24 Motion to Continue. Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2015 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 9/22/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schomburg v. John Henry's Plumbing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Henry's Plumbing Co.
Represented By: Colin A. Mues
Represented By: Gail S. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica M Schomburg
Represented By: Ari D. Riekes
Represented By: Jennifer L. Turco Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?