Robinson v. Kinney et al
Petitioner: |
Danny R. Robinson |
Respondent: |
Mike Kinney and Diane Sabtka-Rine |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2014cv00097 |
Filed: |
March 27, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 7, 2017 |
Filing
56
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: Petitioner is permitted to appeal in forma pauperis. No certificate of appealability will issue. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
|
September 2, 2016 |
Filing
49
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Robinson's petition for writ of habeas corpus and request for an evidentiary hearing are denied. A judgment in conformity with this Memorandum and Order will issue this date. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
|
April 27, 2015 |
Filing
39
ORDER - The plaintiff's Motion for Preparation of Expanded Record (Filing No. 32 ) is denied without prejudice. The plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Index of Evidence in Support of Brief in Response to Respondent's Reply Brief (Filing No. 37 ) is denied without prejudice. The plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for Preparation of Expanded Record (Filing No. 38 ) is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
|
April 22, 2015 |
Filing
34
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Alan Stoler is appointed to represent Robinson in accordance with 18 U.S.C. § 3006A. Alan Stoler is directed to promptly enter his appearance as counsel in this case. No later than May 22, 2015, counsel for Respondents and Alan Stoler shall confer and file a joint motion suggesting a suitable progression of this case. The court will enter an order progressing this case to disposition following the filing of the joint mot ion. The Federal Public Defender is directed to provide Alan Stoler with a CJA voucher in his capacity as administrator of the Criminal Justice Act panel. The clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to Alan Stoler and the Federal Public Defender, along with all other individuals who receive notice of filings in this case. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to petitioner)(copy to Alan Stoler and FPD as directed)(ADB)
|
July 18, 2014 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 filed by Danny R. Robinson. Upon review of the habeas corpus petition, the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order , are potentially cognizable in federal court. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. Pro Se Case Management Deadline: September 1, 2014 deadline for Respondents to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KMG)Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(KMG, )
|
April 15, 2014 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 3 ) is denied. Petitioner shall have until May 26, 2014, to pay the $5.00 filing fee. Petitioner is warned that if the fee is not paid as required, the court may dismiss this case without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: May 26, 2014: deadline for Petitioner to pay $5.00 filing fee. No further review of this case will take place until the filing fee is paid. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?