McGinley v. Douglas County, Nebraska et al
Plaintiff: Maureen McGinley
Defendant: Douglas County Assessor's Office and Douglas County, Nebraska
Case Number: 8:2014cv00121
Filed: April 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: On or before July 16, 2015, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to Chief District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, at smithcamp@ned.uscourt s.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. Pending deadlines are cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED ORDER SETTING PROGRESSION - This case is before the Court on the Joint Proposal for Amended Progression Order 40 . For good cause, the joint proposal is adopted. All depositions, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by October 1, 2015. Motions to dismiss and motions for summary judgment shall be filed not later than September 20, 2015. The June 22, 2015, final pretrial conference and the jury trial set for the week of July 21, 2015, are canc elled, pending settlement or ruling on a dispositive motion. The parties shall file a joint report on or before July 1, 2015, advising the court as to status of settlement negotiations. All requests for changes of deadlines or settings established herein shall be by appropriate motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider (filing 21 ) is denied. However, the parties are directed to confer in an effort to resolve all pending discovery disputes, including scheduling Plaintiff's deposition in a timely manner. Plaintiff's deposition shall not go forward as presently scheduled by Plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGinley v. Douglas County, Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Assessor's Office
Represented By: Sandra K. Connolly
Represented By: Kristin M. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County, Nebraska
Represented By: Sandra K. Connolly
Represented By: Kristin M. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen McGinley
Represented By: Raymond R. Aranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?