Barrett Contracting, Inc. v. Auto Driveway Franchise Systems, et al

Plaintiff: Barrett Contracting, Inc.
Defendant: Auto Driveaway Franchise Systems LLC and Continental Casualty Company
Case Number: 8:2014cv00172
Filed: June 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Interstate Commerce Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Jamie A. Robinson is to pay the biennial assessment. On or before July 6, 2015, attorney Jamie A. Robinson, shall pay the assessment or show cause by written affidavit why she cannot comply with the rules of the court. Failure to comply with this order will result in the court removing Jamie A. Robinson as counsel of record in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KMG)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Make Expert Witness Disclosures, (Filing No. 46 ), is granted and the court's progression order is amended as stated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that the 21 Motion to Set Aside Default is granted and the default entered by the clerk on July 30, 2014 (filing 16) is set aside. The 18 Motion for Default Judgment is denied in all respects. Defendant Auto Driveaway Franchise Systems, LLC, d/b/a/ Driveaway Omaha, shall have 14 days from today's date to answer Plaintiffs complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett Contracting, Inc. v. Auto Driveway Franchise Systems, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Driveaway Franchise Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Brian D. Nolan
Represented By: Susan L. Stryker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barrett Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn J. Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?