September 14, 2016 |
Filing
266
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that all designated objections in the videotape deposition of Eric Van De Graaff, M.D. (Filing No. 265 -2) are overruled. The parties are directed to edit the videotape in accordance with this Order and the process described in their prior Joint Motion in Limine (Filing No. 233 ). Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
|
September 9, 2016 |
Filing
258
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that all designated objections in the videotape deposition of Kent Gleed, M.D. (Filing No. 233 -1) are overruled except a. Page 16, Lines: 20-24 Hearsay and relevancy objections are sustained. b. Page 16, Line: 25 to Page 17, Lines 1-4 Hearsay and relevancy objections are sustained. c. Page 17, Lines: 4-14 Relevancy objections are sustained. d. Page 17, Lines: 15-21 Foundation and relevancy objections are sustained. e. Page 17, Lines: 22-25 to Page 18, Lines 1-8 Foundation and relevancy objections are sustained. The parties are directed to edit the videotape in accordance with this Order and the process described in their Joint Motion in Limine (Filing No. 233 ). Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
|
September 3, 2016 |
Filing
251
ORDER sustaining in part Defendant St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc.'s objections Filing No. 232 to the Magistrate Judge's August 11, 2016, order Filing No. 213 prohibiting the deposition of Dr. Eric Van De Graaff and excluding his testimony at trial. The order is vacated. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JJM)
|
August 30, 2016 |
Filing
247
ORDER that Plaintiff Lisa Tracey is hereby ordered to file any response to St. Jude's Objections to Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Van de Graaff and Her Motion to Quash 232 on or before September 2, 2016. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
|
August 11, 2016 |
Filing
213
ORDER granting 187 Lisa Tracey's Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Van De Graff [sic] and Motion to Quash. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
|
August 5, 2016 |
Filing
208
ORDER denying Lisa Tracey's motions to compel non-party employee personnel records 171 and her unofficial personnel records 180 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
|
April 1, 2016 |
Filing
153
ORDER overruling 105 St. Jude's Objections to Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoenaed Videotaped Deposition Duces Tecum; denying 107 St. Jude's Motion for Protective Order; and granting 121 Tracey's Motion to Compel Issuance of Subpoenas. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
|
December 2, 2015 |
Filing
118
ORDER that plaintiff's Rule 56(d) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 99 ) is denied. The plaintiff shall have until December 18, 2015, to file a response to the defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 94 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
|
October 19, 2015 |
Filing
86
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The plaintiff's objections (Filing No. 66 ), to the order of the magistrate judge (Filing No. 65 ) are overruled. The order of the magistrate judge (Filing No. 65 ) granting the defendant's motio n for a protective order (Filing No. 45 ) is affirmed. The order of the magistrate judge (Filing No. 65 ) denying the plaintiff's motion to compel issuance (Filing No. 48 ) is affirmed, without prejudice to the refiling of the notices of subpoenas of nonparties at a later date. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
|
July 14, 2015 |
Filing
72
AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE granting 71 Unopposed Motion to Extend. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2016 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
|
June 3, 2015 |
Filing
65
ORDER granting 45 Motion for Protective Order. The court will not enter a separate protective order. Tracey's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Notices of Subpoenas Duces Tecum 48 is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
|
January 14, 2015 |
Filing
30
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 the plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the December 1, 2014 Order on Defendant's Motion for Entry of Protective Order to the extent the word "current" is stricken from paragraph 6(f) on page 3 of the Protective Order 21 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
|
December 1, 2014 |
Filing
21
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 19 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
|