Harrold et al v. United States of America, et al
Plaintiff: Geoffrey L Harrold and Connie L Harrold
Defendant: City of Omaha Nebraska and United States of America
Case Number: 8:2014cv00215
Filed: July 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge:
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER granting 33 the defendant United States of America's Second Motion to Continue Answer and Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 Activities. The United States of America shall have fourteen (14) days from the date the court resolves the United States of America's Motion to Reconsider 30 to file an answer in response to the plaintiffs' Complaint 1 . The parties shall have fourteen (14) days thereafter in which to meet, confer, and report to the court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (BJC)
January 23, 2015 Filing 33 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading and Motion to Continue Rule 26 Activities by Attorney Timothy R. Hook on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Hook, Timothy)
January 22, 2015 Filing 32 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Reconsideration regarding Order on Motion to Dismiss, 27 30 by Attorney JoAnna S. DeWald on behalf of Plaintiffs Connie L Harrold, Geoffrey L Harrold.(DeWald, JoAnna)
January 8, 2015 Filing 31 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Reconsideration regarding Order on Motion to Dismiss, 27 30 by Attorney Timothy R. Hook on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Hook, Timothy)
January 8, 2015 Filing 30 MOTION for Reconsideration regarding Order on Motion to Dismiss, 27 by Attorney Timothy R. Hook on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Hook, Timothy)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting 28 the defendant United States of America's Unopposed Motion to Extend Answer and Rule 26(f) Report Deadlines. The United States of America shall have an extension of time until January 29, 2015, to file an answer in response to the plaintiffs' Complaint 1 . The parties shall have until February 12, 2015, to meet, confer, and report to the court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
December 17, 2014 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading and Rule 26(f) Report Deadlines by Attorney Timothy R. Hook on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Hook, Timothy)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the United State's 18 Motion to Dismiss for lack of jurisdiction is denied. The stay of discovery (Filing No. 22) is lifted. The parties shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this order in which to file a planning report with the court pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
October 30, 2014 Filing 26 REPLY BRIEF in support of Defendant United States of America's Motion to Dismiss 18 by Attorney Timothy R. Hook on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Hook, Timothy)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting 24 the defendant United States of America's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. This defendant shall have an extension of time until October 31, 2014, to file a reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss 18 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
October 22, 2014 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Opposition Brief 23 by Attorney Timothy R. Hook on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Hook, Timothy)
October 17, 2014 Filing 23 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss 18 by Attorney JoAnna S. DeWald on behalf of Plaintiffs Connie L Harrold, Geoffrey L Harrold.(DeWald, JoAnna)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting 21 Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery. The parties shall have thirty (30) days from the date the court resolves the United States of America's Motion to Dismiss 18 , in which to file a planning report with the court pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
October 14, 2014 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery and Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 Activities by Attorney Timothy R. Hook on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Hook, Timothy)
September 26, 2014 Filing 20 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss 18 by Attorney Timothy R. Hook on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Hook, Timothy)
September 26, 2014 Filing 19 INDEX in support of MOTION to Dismiss 18 by Attorney Timothy R. Hook on behalf of Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 McConahy Declaration)(Hook, Timothy)
September 26, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Timothy R. Hook on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Hook, Timothy)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING LETTER setting Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline for October 17, 2014. Please use the "Form 35 (Rule 26(f)) Report" posted on the court's website, www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
September 10, 2014 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon United States of America, c/o Eric H. Holder, Jr. defendant Connie L Harrold on 8/4/2014. (Novotny, Mark)
August 20, 2014 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint, 1 by Attorney Michelle A. Peters on behalf of Defendant City of Omaha Nebraska(Peters, Michelle)
August 5, 2014 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant City of Omaha Nebraska on 7/30/2014. (Thomas, JoAnna)
August 5, 2014 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Thomas J. Morrissey, Assistant District Counsel Department of the Army Corps of Engineers, defendant United States of America. (Thomas, JoAnna)
August 5, 2014 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Deborah Gilg, United States Attorney, District of Nebraska, defendant United States of America on 7/30/2014. (Thomas, JoAnna)
July 28, 2014 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to defendants U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorney, City of Omaha and United States of America. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JSF)
July 28, 2014 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA c/o Eric H. Holder, Jr. United States Attorney General regarding Complaint, 1 . (Thomas, JoAnna)
July 28, 2014 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, c/o Deborah R.K. Gilg, United States Attorney, District of Nebraska regarding Complaint, 1 . (Thomas, JoAnna)
July 28, 2014 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to CITY OF OMAHA c/o Buster Brown The Office of the City Clerk regarding Complaint, 1 . (Thomas, JoAnna)
July 28, 2014 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA c/o Thomas J. Morrissey, Assistant District Counsel Department of the Army regarding Complaint, 1 . (Thomas, JoAnna)
July 25, 2014 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken assigned. (ADB, )
July 25, 2014 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA c/o Eric H. Holder, Jr. United States Attorney General regarding Complaint, 1 . (Thomas, JoAnna)
July 25, 2014 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA c/o Deborah R.K. Gilg United States Attorney, District of Nebraska regarding Complaint, 1 . (Thomas, JoAnna)
July 25, 2014 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to CITY OF OMAHA, c/o Buster Brown regarding Complaint, 1 . (Thomas, JoAnna)
July 25, 2014 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to United States of America c/o Thomas J. Morrissey, Assistant District Counsel, Department of the Army Corps of Engineers regarding Complaint, 1 . (Thomas, JoAnna)
July 25, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Connie L Harrold, Geoffrey L Harrold, receipt 0867-2754188 in the amount of $400.00, by Attorney JoAnna S. Thomas on behalf of Connie L Harrold, Geoffrey L Harrold (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Thomas, JoAnna) Modified on 7/25/2014 to add receipt number (ADB, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrold et al v. United States of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey L Harrold
Represented By: JoAnna S. DeWald
Represented By: Mark E. Novotny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie L Harrold
Represented By: JoAnna S. DeWald
Represented By: Mark E. Novotny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Omaha Nebraska
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Timothy R. Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?