Union Pacific Railroad Company v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2014cv00237
Filed: August 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 FINAL JUDGMENT REGARDING EMPLOYEE PORTION OF RRTA TAXES - Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Union Pacific and against the United States on all of Union Pacific's claims for refund of the employee portion of RRTA taxes. The United States is liable for refunds of the employee portion of RRTA taxes paid by Union Pacific for the 19912007 tax years on stock Union Pacific awarded to its employees and on payments Union Pacific made to union members for ratification of collective barga ining agreements in the amount of $23,081,810.56, plus interest. The United States is liable for interest on the above amounts in accordance with 28 U.S.C. §§ 1961(c)(1) and 2411 and 26 U.S.C. §§ 6621 and 6622. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER - that the Court's January 4, 2019 Order (Filing No. 87 ) remains in effect and the parties shall continue to file joint status reports with the Court every 60 days. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER - that the parties shall file a joint status report within 60 days of the date of this order and every sixty days thereafter until this matter is fully resolved. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER - The Government's motion for summary judgment (Filing No. 50 ) is denied. Union Pacific Railroad Company's motion for summary judgment (Filing No. 51 ) is granted. Within 10 days of the date of this order the parties shall confer and contact the chambers of the undersigned to schedule a telephonic conference regarding the refund-calculation issue and the progression and resolution of this action. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: U.P.'s motion for a hearing (Filing No. 45 ) is denied. The government's motion to dismiss (Filing No. 31 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that the defendant's Motion for Protective Order and Amendment of Progression Order (Filing No. 34 ) is granted. The September 15, 2015, Notice of Deposition (Filing No. [35-1]) setting a deposition of Beth Nichols for September 22, 2015 , is quashed. The plaintiff may reschedule the deponent's deposition to be held in October 2015. The December 4, 2014, progression order (Filing No. 13 ) is amended as follows: (a) the plaintiff shall have until October 30, 2015, to file a resp onse to the defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 31 ) and the defendant shall have until November 9, 2015, to file a reply; and (b) the parties shall have until November 23, 2015, to file motions for summary judgment, with extended briefing as previously ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Pacific Railroad Company v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: William F. Colgin, Jr.
Represented By: Mary B. Hevener
Represented By: Steven P. Johnson
Represented By: Robert R. Martinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?