Pearce v. Werner Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charleen A. Pearce
Defendant: Drivers Management, LLC and Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2014cv00290
Filed: September 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JUDGMENT granting 57 Stipulation for Dismissal. Upon the parties' Stipulation to Dismiss (filing 57 ), this matter is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own fees and costs. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (JAB)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 47 Defendants' Motion to Extend. The deadlines and settings within the court's scheduling order, (Filing No. 30 ), are stayed pending further order of the court. Within 10 days after the court rules on the pending motion to disqualify, (Filing No. 42 ), the parties shall contact the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge to schedule a conference call for setting a new progression schedule. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that the motion to withdraw filed by Henry L. Wiedrich, as counsel of record for Defendants Werner Enterprises, Inc. and Drivers Management, LLC (Filing No. 35 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER that Counsel for the parties shall confer and, on or before August 28, 2015, they shall jointly file an abbreviated Rule 26(f) Report, a copy of which is attached. If one or more of the parties believes a planning conference is need ed to complete the abbreviated Rule 26(f) Report, or if the parties cannot agree on one or more of the deadlines identified or case progression issues raised in the attached Rule 26(f) Report, on or before August 21, 2015, a party shall contact my chambers at (402) 437-1670, or by email addressed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, to arrange a conference call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Pearce may submit an amended complaint, if she so chooses, on or before August 12, 2015. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearce v. Werner Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drivers Management, LLC
Represented By: Michaelle L. Baumert
Represented By: Henry L. Wiedrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Michaelle L. Baumert
Represented By: Henry L. Wiedrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charleen A. Pearce
Represented By: Ronald L. Brown
Represented By: Michael J. Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?